FLECTAT LIMITED v. HOLLINGSWORTH
Plaintiff: FLECTAT LIMITED
Defendant: MIA HOLLINGSWORTH
Case Number: 5:2019cv00329
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 20 Discovery Materials - Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by MIA HOLLINGSWORTH. Related document: #19 Certificate of Need to File Discovery filed by MIA HOLLINGSWORTH.(ans)
October 10, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF NEED TO FILE DISCOVERY filed by MIA HOLLINGSWORTH (HOLLINGSWORTH, MIA) Modified docket text on 10/10/2019 (ans).
October 10, 2019 Filing 18 RULE 26(a) DISCLOSURE by FLECTAT LIMITED. Related document: #17 Certificate of Need to File Discovery filed by FLECTAT LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Affidavit of Darren Cubell)(KADAR, TARYN)
October 10, 2019 Filing 17 Certificate of Need to File Discovery by FLECTAT LIMITED. Related document: #16 Scheduling/Discovery Order.(KADAR, TARYN)
October 9, 2019 Filing 16 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery to be complete by 2/7/2020. Dispositive and Daubert motions due by 3/6/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 10/9/2019. (kat)
September 17, 2019 Filing 15 This is a text only entry; no document issued. The Defendant has moved for a hearing, for judgment on the pleadings, and to stay discovery. Docs. 8; 13; 14. Defendant contends that the undisputed facts establish, generally, that Plaintiff is estopped from rescinding her insurance policy. Although the factual issues appear narrow, at least with regard to whether Plaintiff can rescind the policy, the relevant facts are not undisputed. For example, it is not undisputed that the application for insurance did not contain a misrepresentation; that Plaintiff, in any event, was aware of the misrepresentation; and that the alleged misrepresentation was not material. Accordingly, Defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings #13 is DENIED, and her motion to stay discovery #14 is DENIED as moot. Because Defendant's arguments in support of her motion for a hearing are largely the same as those in her motion for judgment on the pleadings, that motion #8 is also DENIED. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 9/17/19. (hmc) Text modified on 9/17/2019 (kat).
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 FIRST MOTION to Stay Discovery Filed by MIA HOLLINGSWORTH.(HOLLINGSWORTH, MIA)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 FIRST MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed by MIA HOLLINGSWORTH. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(HOLLINGSWORTH, MIA)
September 9, 2019 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY CONFERENCE. Scheduling/Discovery Conference PREVIOUSLY set for 9/16/2019 is CANCELLED. Rules 16 and 26 Order sent to parties. (kat)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 10/10/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(kat)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by FLECTAT LIMITED re #8 MOTION for Hearing (KADAR, TARYN)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint,,,, Counterclaim,,, by FLECTAT LIMITED. Related document: #7 Answer to Complaint,,,, Counterclaim,,, filed by MIA HOLLINGSWORTH.(KADAR, TARYN)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by FLECTAT LIMITED. (KADAR, TARYN)
August 21, 2019 NOTICE OF SETTING SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY CONFERENCE: Scheduling/Discovery Conference is set for 9/16/2019 at 2:30 PM in Macon before US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL. (kat)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST MOTION for Hearing Filed by MIA HOLLINGSWORTH. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief is Support of Motion for Speedy Hearing)(HOLLINGSWORTH, MIA)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against FLECTAT LIMITED by MIA HOLLINGSWORTH with Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit Lloyd's Binder Authority Agreement, #3 Exhibit Tapco Relationship with TGI Insurance, #4 Exhibit Quote E-mail from TGI Insurance, #5 Exhibit TGI Quote Letter, #6 Exhibit TGI Builder's Risk letter, #7 Exhibit BR App completed by Defendant, #8 Exhibit Tax Assessor Information Regarding Fire, #9 Exhibit Misrepresentation Letter and App completed by TGI Insurance, #10 Exhibit TGI Premium Payment Receipt, #11 Exhibit Underwriters Insurance Binder, #12 Exhibit Estimate Availability Communication, #13 Exhibit Plaintiff's Rejection of Defendant's Proof of Loss Request, #14 Exhibit Plaintiff's EUO and Document Request, #15 Exhibit Adjuster Estimate, #16 Exhibit Tapco Prospective Cancellation Notice, #17 Exhibit Generic Update Letter)(HOLLINGSWORTH, MIA)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 Georgia Attorney Admission Fee Met by KATHRYN S SHEALY (nop)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 Jurisdictional Statement by FLECTAT LIMITED (KADAR, TARYN)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to MIA HOLLINGSWORTH. (ans)
August 15, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by FLECTAT LIMITED ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. (ans)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to FLECTAT LIMITED (ans)
August 15, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL KATHRYN S SHEALY - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of the $205 admission fee, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (ans)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FLECTAT LIMITED identifying Corporate Parent CANOPIUS HOLDINGS UK LIMITED for FLECTAT LIMITED. (FIELDS, PAUL)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MIA HOLLINGSWORTH Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3236051, $400 filed by FLECTAT LIMITED (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Mia Hollingsworth, #3 Exhibit A - Policy, #4 Exhibit B - Application, #5 Exhibit C - WebQuote Language, #6 Exhibit D - Complaint Prior Lawsuit, #7 Exhibit E - Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #8 Exhibit F - Bibb County Fire Report)(KADAR, TARYN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FLECTAT LIMITED v. HOLLINGSWORTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIA HOLLINGSWORTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLECTAT LIMITED
Represented By: TARYN MICHELLE KADAR
Represented By: PAUL L FIELDS, JR
Represented By: KATHRYN S SHEALY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?