OPPENHEIMER v. BERRY, et al.
Plaintiff: David Oppenheimer
Defendant: Morris Network, Inc., Phillip D. Cox, WDEF-TV, Inc., Ernest R. Berry, ERNEST R BERRY, MORRIS NETWORK INC, BOBBY, PHILLIP D COX and WDEF TV INC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00337
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 ***DISREGARD - Document filed by plaintiff's counsel*** Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #9 Waiver of Service Executed filed by DAVID OPPENHEIMER, #8 Waiver of Service Executed filed by DAVID OPPENHEIMER, #10 Waiver of Service Executed filed by DAVID OPPENHEIMER, #11 Waiver of Service Executed filed by DAVID OPPENHEIMER ); The PACER login ID and password used to electronically file a document constitutes the Participants electronic signature for all purposes under the Federal Rules. All electronically filed documents must include a signature block and must set forth the filers name, address, telephone number and e-mail address. The name on the document and the name associated with the participants login ID must be the same. Document must be re-filed using the user credentials of the name of the attorney in the signature block. (ans) Modified on 10/10/2019 (ans).
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DAVID OPPENHEIMER. as to WDEF TV INC (Andersen, Evan)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DAVID OPPENHEIMER. as to MORRIS NETWORK INC (Andersen, Evan)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DAVID OPPENHEIMER. as to PHILLIP D COX (Andersen, Evan)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DAVID OPPENHEIMER. as to ERNEST R BERRY (Andersen, Evan)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by DANA A LEJUNE, SCOTT M FRANCIS (Attachments: #1 PHV Admission) (nop)
August 29, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #5 Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice, filed by DAVID OPPENHEIMER, #6 Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice, filed by DAVID OPPENHEIMER ); Both petitions state that they are petitions of Evan Anderson. Each petition must reflect the individual attorney in which the petition is being filed on behalf of. No other attorney's name should be reflected on the petition. Also, both petitions should reflect that the attorney "....is now a member in good standing of the State Bar of (name of state in which the attorney is licensed)...." Currently the petitions reflect the name of an attorney. Please email corrected petitions to macon.ecf@gamd.uscourts.gov. (ans)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by DAVID OPPENHEIMER Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3249038, $100 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for Scott M. Francis)(Andersen, Evan) (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/29/2019) (ans).
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by DAVID OPPENHEIMER Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3249033, $100 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for Dana A. LeJune)(Andersen, Evan) (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/29/2019) (ans).
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 AO121, Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. Forwarded this date to the Register of Copyrights, Washington DC. (ans)
August 21, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint,, filed by DAVID OPPENHEIMER ); Documents containing exhibits must include a description of the exhibits. Any future filings with exhibits not containing a description will be required to be re-filed. In this instance, the case administrator has modified the docket to reflect a description of the exhibits.(ans)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to DAVID OPPENHEIMER (ans)
August 21, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL DANA A LEJUNE - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice Admission fee, has not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (ans)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by David Oppenheimer (Andersen, Evan)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3241986, $400 filed by David Oppenheimer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bonaroo Music Festival Aerial Photos, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Registration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Image uploaded to www.wdef.com, #4 Exhibit 4 - Letter dated 10/10/18 from Dana LeJune to Bobby Berry, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Required Form AO121)(Andersen, Evan) Modified to add description of exhibits on 8/21/2019 (ans).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OPPENHEIMER v. BERRY, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Oppenheimer
Represented By: Evan Andrew Andersen
Represented By: DANA A LEJUNE
Represented By: SCOTT M FRANCIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip D. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WDEF-TV, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest R. Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERNEST R BERRY
Represented By: Shaun Michael Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORRIS NETWORK INC
Represented By: Shaun Michael Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOBBY
Represented By: Shaun Michael Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIP D COX
Represented By: Shaun Michael Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WDEF TV INC
Represented By: Shaun Michael Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?