SPIRES v. MONSANTO COMPANY
Plaintiff: HENRY SPIRES
Defendant: MONSANTO COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00348
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to NOrthern District of California. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 11/7/2019. (ggs)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 MDL TRANSFER ORDER transferring proceedings TO Northern District of California for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (ggs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/25/2019: #1 Certified copy of Order) (ggs).
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HENRY SPIRES as to MONSANTO COMPANY. (GARRETT, R)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to HENRY SPIRES (ggs)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to MONSANTO COMPANY. (ggs)
August 30, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by HENRY SPIRES ); The Civil Cover Sheet states that the nature of the suit is #367 HealthCare/Pharmaceutical Personal injury Product Liability, but during the case opening #245 Tort Product Liability was selected. After a review of the pleading, the case manager determined that #245 Tort Product Liability is the correct selection for the nature of suit. NO NEED TO REFILE - this notice is for informational and clarification purposes only.(ggs)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MONSANTO COMPANY Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3251088, $400 filed by HENRY SPIRES (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(GARRETT, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPIRES v. MONSANTO COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY SPIRES
Represented By: R WALKER GARRETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONSANTO COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?