ALVERSON v. C R BARD INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: HARLEIGH ALVERSON
Defendant: C R BARD INCORPORATED and BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED
Case Number: 5:2019cv00362
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 14 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by All Plaintiffs Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3308239, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Doug Chanco 139711. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(MURPHY, JASON)
November 6, 2019 Filing 13 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 12/6/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 11/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(chc)
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by HARLEIGH ALVERSON filed by KAROLINA S SOUTHARD.(SOUTHARD, KAROLINA)
November 5, 2019 Notice (related document(s): Notice to Attorney Re: Admissions Requirement); Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1.4, an attorney (other than a government attorney) appearing of record in any action pending in this district, who wishes to withdraw as counsel for any party therein, shall submit a written motion for an order of court permitting such withdrawal. A Motion to Withdraw As Attorney must be filed. (ans)
September 25, 2019 SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL Karolina S Southard - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (nop)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 Jurisdictional Statement by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED, C R BARD INCORPORATED (WESTBY, LUCAS)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED, C R BARD INCORPORATED identifying Corporate Parent BECTON DICKINSON AND COMPANY for BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED, C R BARD INCORPORATED. (WESTBY, LUCAS)
September 16, 2019 Notice of Deficiency : Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1 and 87.2, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement and a separate Jurisdictional Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures and jurisdictional statement. (vs)
September 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by LEE ANN ANAND on behalf of BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED, C R BARD INCORPORATED Attorney LEE ANN ANAND added to party BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED(pty:dft), Attorney LEE ANN ANAND added to party C R BARD INCORPORATED(pty:dft) (ANAND, LEE)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by LUCAS ALLEN WESTBY on behalf of BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED, C R BARD INCORPORATED Attorney LUCAS ALLEN WESTBY added to party BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED(pty:dft), Attorney LUCAS ALLEN WESTBY added to party C R BARD INCORPORATED(pty:dft) (WESTBY, LUCAS)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to HARLEIGH ALVERSON (vs)
September 10, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Karolina S Southard - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (vs)
September 10, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III. (vs)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 MDL TRANSFER ORDER transferring proceedings Middle District of Georgia from Arizona USDC. (Attachments: #1 Bard Docket Sheet (Main MDL Case), #2 Notice of Filing Submission, #3 Case Management Orders, #4 Daubert Orders, #5 Deposition Designation Orders, #6 Discovery and Privilege Orders, #7 Discovery Orders, #8 Master and Short Form Pleadings, #9 Miscellaneous Orders, #10 Motions in Limine Orders) (vs)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:17-cv-00642. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**
September 6, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to Middle District of Georgia via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 9/9/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 9/9/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/9/2019.]
March 3, 2017 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-0642-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from azd on 9/9/2019.]
March 3, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13978786 filed by Harleigh Alverson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from azd on 9/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALVERSON v. C R BARD INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R BARD INCORPORATED
Represented By: RICHARD B NORTH, JR
Represented By: LEE ANN ANAND
Represented By: LUCAS ALLEN WESTBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED
Represented By: RICHARD B NORTH, JR
Represented By: LEE ANN ANAND
Represented By: LUCAS ALLEN WESTBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARLEIGH ALVERSON
Represented By: Karolina S Southard
Represented By: JASON MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?