SHAREEF v. SECRETARY OF VETERANS AFFAIRS et al
Plaintiff: WILLIAM LINDY REID and KHALILAH A SHAREEF
Defendant: GINNIE MAE, SECRETARY OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER TURNER ENGEL LLC, MCCALLA RAYMER LIEBERT PIERCE LLC, WELLS FARGO BANK NA, Houston County Magistrate Court and BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER TURNER AND ENGEL LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00483
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT (ans)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis but DISMISSING case as frivolous. Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and #4 Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction are DENIED as moot. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E. SELF, III on 12/17/2019. (ech)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED MOTION Amending #1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Filed by KHALILAH A SHAREEF. (Attachments: #1 Attachments not marked as exhibits)(ans)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to KHALILAH A SHAREEF (ans)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by KHALILAH A SHAREEF.(ans)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by KHALILAH A SHAREEF. (Attachments: #1 Attachments to Complaint not marked as exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ans) Modified event type on 12/10/2019 (ans).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHAREEF v. SECRETARY OF VETERANS AFFAIRS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GINNIE MAE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECRETARY OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER TURNER ENGEL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCCALLA RAYMER LIEBERT PIERCE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston County Magistrate Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER TURNER AND ENGEL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM LINDY REID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KHALILAH A SHAREEF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?