CUTLER v. WARNER ROBINS GEORGIA et al
Plaintiff: BENJAMIN LESTER CUTLER, III
Defendant: WARNER ROBINS GEORGIA and HOUSTON COUNTY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00514
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Referring Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASE Lead Case # 5:19-cv-511. Member Case # 5:19cv514. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 1/17/2020. (ggs)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION filed by BENJAMIN LESTER CUTLER, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(mdm)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION filed by BENJAMIN LESTER CUTLER, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(mdm)
January 4, 2020 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to BENJAMIN LESTER CUTLER, III (deb)
January 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (deb)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by BENJAMIN LESTER CUTLER, III.. Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(deb)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HOUSTON COUNTY, WARNER ROBINS GEORGIA,filed by BENJAMIN LESTER CUTLER, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(deb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CUTLER v. WARNER ROBINS GEORGIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARNER ROBINS GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOUSTON COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENJAMIN LESTER CUTLER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?