HINKELMAN v. NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: SANDRA HINKELMAN
Defendant: JANE DOE, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, JOHN DOE, XYZ CO. and ABC CO.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00164
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 8 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 6/9/2020. (kat)
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery to be complete by 12/8/2020. Dispositive Daubert motions due by 1/8/2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 6/9/2020. (kat)
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 6/8/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 5/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(kat)
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORPORATION, Other Affiliate GEORGIA SOUTHERN AND FLORIDA RAILWAY COMPANY, Other Affiliate AIRFORCE PIPELINE INC, Other Affiliate Alabama Great Southern LLC, Other Affiliate Camp Lejeune Railroad Company, Other Affiliate Central of Georgia LLC, Other Affiliate Chesapeake Western Railway, Other Affiliate Citico Realty Company, Other Affiliate HIGH POINT RANDLEMAN ASHEBORO AND SOUTHERN RAILROAD COMPANY, Other Affiliate Interstate Railroad Company, Other Affiliate Mobile and Birmingham Railroad Company, Other Affiliate Rail Investment Company, Other Affiliate State University Railroad Company, Other Affiliate Tennessee Railway Company, Other Affiliate THOROUGHBRED DIRECT INTERMODAL SERVICES INC, Other Affiliate Triple Crown Services Company, Other Affiliate Virginia and Southwestern Railway Company, Other Affiliate Wheelersburg Terminal LLC, Other Affiliate Yadkin Railroad Company, Other Affiliate TRANSWORK INC, Other Affiliate ALABAMA GREAT SOUTHERN RAILROAD COMPANY, Other Affiliate CINCINNATI NEW ORLEANS AND TEXAS PACIFIC RAILWAY COMPANY, Other Affiliate NORFOLK AND PORTSMOUTH BELT LINE RAILROAD COMPANY, Other Affiliate NORTH CAROLINA MIDLAND RAILROAD COMPANY, Other Affiliate SOUTH WESTERN RAIL ROAD COMPANY, Other Affiliate READING COMPANY LLC DELAWARE, Other Affiliate READING COMPANY LLC VIRGINIA, Other Affiliate CHICAGO LAND MANAGEMENT LLC, Other Affiliate THOROUGHBRED EMISSIONS RESEARCH LLC, Other Affiliate THOROUGHBRED FUNDING INC, Other Affiliate LAMBERTS POINT BARGE COMPANY LLC, Other Affiliate NORFOLK SOUTHERN INTERNATIONAL INC, Other Affiliate SOUTHERN RAIL TERMINALS INC, Other Affiliate NORFOLK SOUTHERN MEXICANA S DE R L DE C V, Other Affiliate SOUTHERN RAIL TERMINALS OF NORTH CAROLINA INC, Other Affiliate SOUTHERN REGION MATERIALS SUPPLY INC, Other Affiliate TCS LEASING INC, Other Affiliate TCV INC, Other Affiliate PLAINTIFFS INVESTMENT LLC, Other Affiliate TRANSWORK OF INDIANA INC, Other Affiliate NORFOLK SOUTHERN-MEXICO LLC, Other Affiliate S-VA CORPORATION, Other Affiliate TENNESSEE ALABAMA & GEORGIA RAILWAY COMPANY, Other Affiliate CENTRAL OF GEORGIA RAILROAD COMPANY for NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (STEWART, WALKER)
April 29, 2020 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (vs)
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 Jurisdictional Statement by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (STEWART, WALKER)
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY.(STEWART, WALKER)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against SANDRA HINKELMAN Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3453251, $400 filed by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Ex B Norfolk Southern Information, #3 Exhibit Ex C List of Plaintiff's treatment, #4 Exhibit Ex D Plaintiff's Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit Ex E Excerpt from NGMC Record, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(STEWART, WALKER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HINKELMAN v. NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN A WILKERSON
Represented By: WALKER STEVEN STEWART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA HINKELMAN
Represented By: WILLIAM T JOYNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?