HAMMOND v. BIBB COUNTY COURTHOUSE et al
Plaintiff: PAMELA-LEE HAMMOND
Defendant: MACON HOSPITAL, BIBB COUNTY COURTHOUSE, MEDICAL CENTER and SECRETARY OF STATE FOR THE STATE OF GEORGIA
Case Number: 5:2020cv00276
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Referring Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Plaintiffs Request for CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to BIBB COUNTY COURTHOUSE, MACON HOSPITAL, SECRETARY OF STATE FOR THE STATE OF GEORGIA is DECLINED. (vs)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 Letter from Pamela Lee Hammond requesting a copy of the case docket sheet. *Mailed copy of case docket sheet to Plaintiff*** (vs)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against BIBB COUNTY COURTHOUSE, MACON HOSPITAL, SECRETARY OF STATE FOR THE STATE OF GEORGIA (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs)
September 1, 2020 Pursuant to F.R.A.P 11(c) the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Georgia certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: #6 Notice of Appeal. The entire record on appeal is available electronically (vs)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 USCA Case Number 20-12822-J re #6 Notice of Appeal filed by PAMELA-LEE HAMMOND. (vs)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #6 Notice of Appeal, #5 Judgment Judge Appealed: Tilman E. Self, III. Fee: IFP Granted. (vs)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #5 Judgment by PAMELA-LEE HAMMOND. (Attachments: #1 Second Notice)(vs)
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 JUDGMENT (vs)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and dismissing this case without prejudice as frivolous. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 7/13/2020. (chc)
July 10, 2020 Case REASSIGNED to US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III. CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL no longer assigned to the case. (vs)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to PAMELA-LEE HAMMOND (vs)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by PAMELA-LEE HAMMOND.(vs)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BIBB COUNTY COURTHOUSE, MACON HOSPITAL, SECRETARY OF STATE FOR THE STATE OF GEORGIA,filed by PAMELA-LEE HAMMOND. (Attachments: #1 Summons Proposed Summons - Bibb County Courthouse, #2 Summons Proposed Summons - Medical Center Navicent Health, #3 Summons Proposed Summons - Secretary of the State, #4 Affidavit, #5 Cover Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Envelope)(vs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAMMOND v. BIBB COUNTY COURTHOUSE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MACON HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIBB COUNTY COURTHOUSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECRETARY OF STATE FOR THE STATE OF GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMELA-LEE HAMMOND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?