BOYD v. BRENWER et al
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER BOYD
Defendant: LIEUTENANT BOO, WARDEN BRENWER and CAPTAIN STANDFORD
Case Number: 5:2020cv00300
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Referring Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Filed by CHRISTOPHER BOYD. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(tam)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: that Plaintiffhas FOURTEEN (14) days from the date shown on this Order to complete and return the enclosed 42 U.S.C. 1983 form and either pay the $400.00 filing fee or complete and return the motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Should he fail to do so, the action will be dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to forward to Plaintiff the appropriate 1983 and informa pauperis forms along with a copy of this Order (all showing the civil action number) Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 08/26/2020. (vs)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to CHRISTOPHER BOYD. (tam)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tam)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Filed by CHRISTOPHER BOYD. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(tam)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by CHRISTOPHER BOYD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Offender Grievance Form, #2 Exhibit A,B,C- Receipt for Grievance at Counselor's Level, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Envelope)(tam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOYD v. BRENWER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIEUTENANT BOO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARDEN BRENWER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPTAIN STANDFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER BOYD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?