WEST v. GIBBONS et al
Plaintiff: EARL LEWIS WEST
Defendant: DEPUTY WARDEN GIBBONS, SERGEANT DANIEL GREENE, SERGEANT JOHN WILLIAMS and CERT OFFICER DANZY
Case Number: 5:2020cv00321
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Referring Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 Acknowledgment of Electronic Case Transfer Out by District of Southern District of Georgia; Case Number 3:20-cv-55. (ggs)
August 28, 2020 Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Southern District of Georgia. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**(Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 9/11/2020.) (ggs)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 8/28/2020. (kat)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from EARL LEWIS WEST requesting copy of docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to EARL LEWIS WEST. (ggs)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (ggs)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by EARL LEWIS WEST. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(ggs)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by EARL LEWIS WEST. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WEST v. GIBBONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EARL LEWIS WEST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUTY WARDEN GIBBONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERGEANT DANIEL GREENE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERGEANT JOHN WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERT OFFICER DANZY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?