MIDDLEBROOKS v. MACON OPERATING, LLC et al
Plaintiff: SANDRA MIDDLEBROOKS
Defendant: MACON OPERATING, LLC doing business as FOUNTAIN BLUE REHAB AND NURSING, LIBBY BRECHER, CHANA LICHTMAN, SARA LICHTMAN, JACOB ZIMMERMAN, PINNY ZWEIG, MACON HOLDINGS GROUP, LLC, MENDEL BRECHER and ANSHEL NIEDERMAN
Case Number: 5:2020cv00323
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #9 Certificate of Service filed by LIBBY BRECHER, MACON HOLDINGS GROUP, LLC, MACON OPERATING, LLC, ANSHEL NIEDERMAN, CHANA LICHTMAN, SARA LICHTMAN, MENDEL BRECHER ); Pursuant to Local Rule 5.1 Discovery is not filed in the Middle District of Georgia.(tam)
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LIBBY BRECHER, MENDEL BRECHER, CHANA LICHTMAN, SARA LICHTMAN, MACON HOLDINGS GROUP, LLC, MACON OPERATING, LLC, ANSHEL NIEDERMAN (HILTON, HAROLD)
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 9/24/2020. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 8/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(kat)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 Jurisdictional Statement by LIBBY BRECHER, MENDEL BRECHER, CHANA LICHTMAN, SARA LICHTMAN, MACON HOLDINGS GROUP, LLC, MACON OPERATING, LLC, ANSHEL NIEDERMAN, JACOB ZIMMERMAN, PINNY ZWEIG (HILTON, HAROLD)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LIBBY BRECHER, MENDEL BRECHER, CHANA LICHTMAN, SARA LICHTMAN, MACON HOLDINGS GROUP, LLC, MACON OPERATING, LLC, ANSHEL NIEDERMAN identifying Other Affiliate MACON HOLDINGS GROUP LLC for MACON OPERATING, LLC. (HILTON, HAROLD)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to LIBBY BRECHER, MENDEL BRECHER, CHANA LICHTMAN, SARA LICHTMAN, MACON HOLDINGS GROUP, LLC, MACON OPERATING, LLC, ANSHEL NIEDERMAN, JACOB ZIMMERMAN, PINNY ZWEIG. (tam)
August 18, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by PINNY ZWEIG, JACOB ZIMMERMAN, MACON OPERATING, LLC, CHANA LICHTMAN, SARA LICHTMAN, LIBBY BRECHER, MACON HOLDINGS GROUP, LLC, ANSHEL NIEDERMAN, MENDEL BRECHER ); Notice to Counsel - (H. Eric Hilton) Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER.(tam)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by PINNY ZWEIG with Jury Demand.(MORGAN, ASYA)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by MACON OPERATING, LLC with Jury Demand.(MORGAN, ASYA)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by LIBBY BRECHER, MENDEL BRECHER, CHANA LICHTMAN, SARA LICHTMAN, MACON HOLDINGS GROUP, LLC, ANSHEL NIEDERMAN, JACOB ZIMMERMAN with Jury Demand.(MORGAN, ASYA)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3541906, $400 filed by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Entry of Service Macon Operating, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Service P.Zweig, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Service S. Lichtman, #5 Exhibit Affidavit of Service L. Brecher, #6 Exhibit Affidavit of Service J.Zimmerman, #7 Exhibit Affidavit of Service C. Lichtman, #8 Exhibit Affidavit of Service A. Niederman, #9 Exhibit Affidavit of Service M. Brecher, #10 Exhibit Plaintiff's Interrogatories, #11 Exhibit Plaintiff's Request for Production, #12 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(MORGAN, ASYA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MIDDLEBROOKS v. MACON OPERATING, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MACON OPERATING, LLC doing business as FOUNTAIN BLUE REHAB AND NURSING
Represented By: ASYA LORRENE MORGAN
Represented By: HAROLD ERIC HILTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBBY BRECHER
Represented By: ASYA LORRENE MORGAN
Represented By: HAROLD ERIC HILTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHANA LICHTMAN
Represented By: ASYA LORRENE MORGAN
Represented By: HAROLD ERIC HILTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARA LICHTMAN
Represented By: ASYA LORRENE MORGAN
Represented By: HAROLD ERIC HILTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACOB ZIMMERMAN
Represented By: ASYA LORRENE MORGAN
Represented By: HAROLD ERIC HILTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PINNY ZWEIG
Represented By: ASYA LORRENE MORGAN
Represented By: HAROLD ERIC HILTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MACON HOLDINGS GROUP, LLC
Represented By: ASYA LORRENE MORGAN
Represented By: HAROLD ERIC HILTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MENDEL BRECHER
Represented By: ASYA LORRENE MORGAN
Represented By: HAROLD ERIC HILTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANSHEL NIEDERMAN
Represented By: ASYA LORRENE MORGAN
Represented By: HAROLD ERIC HILTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA MIDDLEBROOKS
Represented By: CASEY LENORA GRAY
Represented By: Katherine Lee McArthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?