SOUTHERN TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY v. GUIDEWIRE SOFTWARE INC.
Plaintiff: SOUTHERN TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: GUIDEWIRE SOFTWARE INC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00327
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response filed by GUIDEWIRE SOFTWARE INC re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Case Pending Arbitration and Brief in Support (RUBENFIELD, ADAM)
September 21, 2020 Georgia Attorney Admission Fee Met by ADAM S RUBENFIELD (nop)
September 21, 2020 Filing 13 Minute Entry (content for administrative purposes only) for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III: Telephone Conference held on 9/21/2020. Court Reporter: Darlene Fuller.Time in Court: 24 minutes. (chc)
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER extending deadlines contained in #9 Rules 16/26 Order until the Court makes ruling on #4 Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Case Pending Arbitration and Brief in Support filed by GUIDEWIRE SOFTWARE INC. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E. SELF, III on 9/21/2020. (ech)
September 18, 2020 NOTICE OF SETTING hearing. Telephone Conference set for 9/21/2020 at 11:00 AM in Macon before US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF III. Call-in instructions will be sent to the parties by email. (chc)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by SOUTHERN TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Case Pending Arbitration and Brief in Support (DUBBERLY, BRUCE)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SOUTHERN TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY (SCHULTZ, LAUREN)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 10/1/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(chc)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GUIDEWIRE SOFTWARE INC identifying Other Affiliate GUIDEWIRE SOFTWARE FRANCE, Other Affiliate GUIDEWIRE SOFTWARE (BEJING) CO LTD, Other Affiliate GUIDEWIRE SOFTWARE GMBH, Other Affiliate GUIDEWIRE SOFTWARE CANADA LTD, Other Affiliate GUIDEWIRE SERVICIOUS DE SOFTWARE SERV, Other Affiliate GUIDEWIRE SOFTWARE (IRELAND) LIMITED, Other Affiliate GUIDEWIRE SOFTWARE POLAND SP ZOO, Other Affiliate GUIDEWIRE SOFTWARE JAPAN KK, Other Affiliate GUIDEWIRE SOFTWARE ITALY SRL, Other Affiliate CYENCE LLC, Other Affiliate CYENCE INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED, Other Affiliate ISCS ANALYTICS LLC, Other Affiliate MILLBROOK INC, Other Affiliate FIRSTBEST SYSTEMS INC, Other Affiliate EAGLEEYE ANALYTICS for GUIDEWIRE SOFTWARE INC. (RUBENFIELD, ADAM)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 Jurisdictional Statement by GUIDEWIRE SOFTWARE INC (RUBENFIELD, ADAM)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by BRUCE D DUBBERLY, IV on behalf of SOUTHERN TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY Attorney BRUCE D DUBBERLY, IV added to party SOUTHERN TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:pla)(DUBBERLY, BRUCE)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by LAUREN N SCHULTZ on behalf of SOUTHERN TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY Attorney LAUREN N SCHULTZ added to party SOUTHERN TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:pla)(SCHULTZ, LAUREN)
August 20, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL ADAM S RUBENFIELD - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled.(tam)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Case Pending Arbitration and Brief in Support by GUIDEWIRE SOFTWARE INC filed by David J Hungeling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - STIC's Petition from Bibb County Superior Court (with Exhibits), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Mike Polelle (with Exhibits), #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - May 21, 2020 Email from L. Schultz to AAA, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - August 4, 2020 Letter from AAA to party counsel)(Hungeling, David)
August 19, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #2 Motion to Compel, filed by GUIDEWIRE SOFTWARE INC ); Document must be re-filed to include a description of exhibit(s).(tam)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to GUIDEWIRE SOFTWARE INC. (tam)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 ***RE-FILED AT #4 *** MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Case Pending Arbitration and Brief in Support by Guidewire Software, Inc. filed by David J Hungeling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 2D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Hungeling, David) Modified to add docket text on 8/20/2020 (tam).
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Southern Trust Insurance Company Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3543591, $400 filed by Guidewire Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Removal Documents Ex. A - Filings from State Court Case, #3 Exhibit Ex. B - Declaration of J. Chen with attachments)(Hungeling, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOUTHERN TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY v. GUIDEWIRE SOFTWARE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTHERN TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: LEE M GILLIS, JR
Represented By: BRUCE D DUBBERLY, IV
Represented By: LAUREN N SCHULTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUIDEWIRE SOFTWARE INC
Represented By: David J Hungeling
Represented By: ADAM S RUBENFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?