PITTS v. CONSTITUTION STATE SERVICE LLC et al
Plaintiff: ERNEST PITTS, JR
Defendant: CONSTITUTION STATE SERVICE LLC, INGLES MARKETS INC and SHANNON SWERDZEWSKI
Case Number: 5:2020cv00328
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 JUDGMENT (ggs)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 RESPONSE to Court Order (construed as Motion for Voluntary Dismissal) filed by ERNEST PITTS, JR. The case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 10/9/2020. (kat)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by ERNEST PITTS, JR re #4 Order, Order to Amend/Recast/Supplement Complaint, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Claim continued, #2 Correspondece from Ingles Claim Dept, #3 Order (ECF #4), #4 Envelope)(ggs) Text modified on 10/8/2020 (kat).
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. ORDER to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff is ORDERED to amend his complaint to include all defendants and facts that he wishes to make a part of these proceedings no later than October 3, 2020. The Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to send the Plaintiff a new complaint form. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 9/3/2020. (kat)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to ERNEST PITTS, JR (ggs)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by ERNEST PITTS, JR.(ggs) Modified on 8/20/2020 to correct filing date. (ggs).
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CONSTITUTION STATE SERVICE LLC, INGLES MARKETS INC, SHANNON SWERDZEWSKI, by ERNEST PITTS, JR. (ggs) Modified on 8/20/2020 to correct filing date. (ggs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PITTS v. CONSTITUTION STATE SERVICE LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERNEST PITTS, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSTITUTION STATE SERVICE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGLES MARKETS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHANNON SWERDZEWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?