MASON v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: Joyce Mason
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Case Number: 5:2020cv00329
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Referring Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. (tam)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. (tam)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Civil Process, #2 USM 285 ORCC)(tam)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. (Attachments: #1 Summons Civil Clerk, #2 Summons ORCC)(tam)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 08/20/2020 (tam)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to JOYCE MASON. (tam)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tam)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joyce Mason filed by DARYL JAMES MORTON. (Attachments: #1 Required Form IFP Application, #2 Summons). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(MORTON, DARYL)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP) against Joyce Mason filed by Joyce Mason (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MORTON, DARYL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MASON v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Mason
Represented By: DARYL JAMES MORTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?