GRAY et al v. FAY SERVICING AND DOES 1 TO 50
Plaintiff: EARLENE GRAY and GREGORY J. GRAY
Defendant: FAY SERVICING AND DOES 1 TO 50
Case Number: 5:2020cv00377
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER construing filing as a Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and ordering Plaintiffs to file a Proposed Amended Complaint by December 1, 2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E. SELF, III on 11/17/2020. (ech)
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 REPLY to Response filed by FAY SERVICING AND DOES 1 TO 50 re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (GREEN, JONATHAN)
October 27, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE filed by EARLENE GRAY, GREGORY J. GRAY re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (tam)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FAY SERVICING AND DOES 1 TO 50 identifying Corporate Parent FAY MANAGEMENT LLC for FAY SERVICING AND DOES 1 TO 50. (GREEN, JONATHAN)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by FAY SERVICING AND DOES 1 TO 50 filed by JONATHAN E GREEN. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-Citi Security Deed, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B-First Assignment, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C-Second Assignment, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D-Third Assignment, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E-Fourth Assignment, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F-Subordination Agreement, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G-MIC Security Deed, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H-Deed Under Power)(GREEN, JONATHAN)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against FAY SERVICING AND DOES 1 TO 50 Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3575747, $400 filed by FAY SERVICING AND DOES 1 TO 50 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Copy of Complaint and all process, pleadings, and orders served upon Defendants, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2-Record of Houston County Board of Assessors for Property, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3-Notice to Superior Court of Removal, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4-Notice to Plaintiff of Removal)(GREEN, JONATHAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRAY et al v. FAY SERVICING AND DOES 1 TO 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EARLENE GRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY J. GRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAY SERVICING AND DOES 1 TO 50
Represented By: JONATHAN E GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?