ONE SOUTH BANK v. TITSHAW et al
Plaintiff: OneSouth Bank and ONE SOUTH BANK
Defendant: Global Produce Sales, Inc., Mark A. Elliott, Lee Allen Wroten, III, Stephen Ross Nichols, Herman Curt Titshaw, Summer Time Melons, LLC, Crisp Melons, Inc., MARK A ELLIOTT, CRISP MELONS INC, SUMMER TIME MELONS LLC and GLOBAL PRODUCE SALES INC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00379
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by MARK A ELLIOTT, CRISP MELONS INC, GLOBAL PRODUCE SALES INC, SUMMER TIME MELONS LLC, STEPHEN ROSS NICHOLS, LEE ALLEN WROTEN, III filed by IVY NEAL CADLE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dec. of Elliott, #2 Exhibit Dec. of Nichols, #3 Exhibit Dec. of Wroten)(CADLE, IVY)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by NICHOLAS L SELLARS, EDWARD B PAUL (Attachments: #1 PHV admission) (nop)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by CRISP MELONS INC, GLOBAL PRODUCE SALES INC, SUMMER TIME MELONS LLC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3616358, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Ivy Cadle 353227. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Nicholars Sellars Certificate of Good Standing)(CADLE, IVY)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by CRISP MELONS INC, GLOBAL PRODUCE SALES INC, SUMMER TIME MELONS LLC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3616345, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Ivy Cadle 353227. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Edward B. Paul Certificate of Good Standing)(CADLE, IVY)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ONE SOUTH BANK as to HERMAN CURT TITSHAW. (SMITH, GREGORY) Modified to add docket text on 11/5/2020 (tam).
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION For Extension of Time to Answer by GLOBAL PRODUCE SALES INC, STEPHEN ROSS NICHOLS, LEE ALLEN WROTEN, III (CADLE, IVY)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ONE SOUTH BANK. as to MARK A ELLIOTT, CRISP MELONS INC, SUMMER TIME MELONS LLC (SMITH, GREGORY) Modified to correct docket text on 10/20/2020 (tam).
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ONE SOUTH BANK as to Stephen Ross Nichols (SMITH, GREGORY) Modified to add docket text on 10/13/2020 (tam).
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ONE SOUTH BANK as to Global Produce Sales, INC. (SMITH, GREGORY) Modified to add docket text on 10/13/2020 (tam).
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ONE SOUTH BANK as to defendant Lee Allen Wroten (SMITH, GREGORY) Modified to add docket text on 10/13/2020 (tam).
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Seal #1 Complaint. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 9/29/2020. (kat)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COMPLAINT against MARK A ELLIOTT, CRISP MELONS INC, GLOBAL PRODUCE SALES INC, SUMMER TIME MELONS LLC, STEPHEN ROSS NICHOLS, HERMAN CURT TITSHAW, LEE ALLEN WROTEN, III filed by ONE SOUTH BANK (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B - Loan Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Commercial Loan Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Security Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - Certification of Buyers, #6 Exhibit F - Notice of Security Interest, #7 Exhibit G - UCC Filing Statements, #8 Exhibit H - Titshaw Demand Letter, #9 Exhibit I - Buyer Demand Letters)(SMITH, GREGORY) Modified to correct docket text on 9/29/2020 (tam).
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIRST MOTION to Seal Document(s) #1 Complaint,,, by ONE SOUTH BANK filed by GREGORY DAVIS SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Seal Documents)(SMITH, GREGORY)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ONE SOUTH BANK identifying Corporate Parent OneSouth Financial, Inc. for ONE SOUTH BANK. (SMITH, GREGORY)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summer Times Melons, #2 Summons Crisp Melons, #3 Summons Global Produce Sales, #4 Summons Stephen Ross Nichols, #5 Summons Lee Allen Wroten, #6 Summons Mark Elliott)(tam)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ***SEALED*** COMPLAINT against Crisp Melons, Inc., Mark A. Elliott, Global Produce Sales, Inc., Stephen Ross Nichols, Summer Time Melons, LLC, Herman Curt Titshaw, Lee Allen Wroten, III Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3578422, $400 filed by OneSouth Bank (Attachments: #1 Required Form Corporate Disclosure Form, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Affidavit Verification, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B - Loan Agreement, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C - Commercial Loan Agreement, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D - Security Agreement, #9 Exhibit Exhibit E - Certification of Buyers, #10 Exhibit Exhibit F - Notice of Security Interest, #11 Exhibit Exhibit G - UCC Financing Statements, #12 Exhibit Exhibit H - Titshaw Demand Letter, #13 Exhibit Exhibit I - Buyer Demand Letters)(SMITH, GREGORY) Modified to add docket text on 9/29/2020 (tam).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ONE SOUTH BANK v. TITSHAW et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Produce Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Allen Wroten, III
Represented By: IVY NEAL CADLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Ross Nichols
Represented By: IVY NEAL CADLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herman Curt Titshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summer Time Melons, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crisp Melons, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK A ELLIOTT
Represented By: IVY NEAL CADLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRISP MELONS INC
Represented By: IVY NEAL CADLE
Represented By: NICHOLAS L SELLARS
Represented By: EDWARD B PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUMMER TIME MELONS LLC
Represented By: IVY NEAL CADLE
Represented By: NICHOLAS L SELLARS
Represented By: EDWARD B PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLOBAL PRODUCE SALES INC
Represented By: IVY NEAL CADLE
Represented By: NICHOLAS L SELLARS
Represented By: EDWARD B PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OneSouth Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ONE SOUTH BANK
Represented By: JASON MARCUS
Represented By: GREGORY DAVIS SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?