ROBERTS v. ADAMS et al
Plaintiff: STACEY HASLEM ROBERTS
Defendant: JUDGE G.E. "BO" ADAMS, ROBINS FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION, ATLANTA POSTAL CREDIT UNION, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICES, WARNER ROBINS POLICE DEPARTMENT and HOUSTON COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT
Case Number: 5:2020cv00450
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT re #13 RESPONSE to Court Order by STACEY HASLEM ROBERTS (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs)
January 25, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by STACEY HASLEM ROBERTS re #12 Order on Motion for Reconsideration (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING #8 Motion for Reconsideration re #6 Order. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 1/5/2021. (kat)
January 4, 2021 Filing 11 USCA Case Number 20-14857-JJ re #9 Notice of Appeal filed by STACEY HASLEM ROBERTS. (vs)
December 30, 2020 Filing 10 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #7 Judgment, #9 Notice of Appeal, #6 Order Judge Appealed: Marc T. Treadwell. Fee: Not Paid. (tam)
December 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #6 Order; #7 Judgment by STACEY HASLEM ROBERTS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tam) Modified to correct docket text on 12/30/2020 (tam).
December 30, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Reconsideration re #6 Order Filed by STACEY HASLEM ROBERTS. (Attachments: #1 Attachment- Original Complaint, #2 Envelope)(tam)
December 22, 2020 Filing 7 JUDGMENT (vs)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #4 Amended Complaint/Petition filed by STACEY HASLEM ROBERTS. The #4 Amended Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 12/22/2020. (kat)
December 16, 2020 Filing 5 EXHIBIT(S) by STACEY HASLEM ROBERTS re #4 Amended Complaint/Petition (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs)
December 16, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED #1 Complaint, against UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICES by STACEY HASLEM ROBERTS (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. ORDER to Amend Complaint: The plaintiff is ORDERED to amend her complaint to include all defendants and facts that she wishes to make a part of these proceedings no later than December 21, 2020. The Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to send the plaintiff a new complaint form. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 12/3/2020. (kat)
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by STACEY HASLEM ROBERTS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tam)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by STACEY HASLEM ROBERTS. (Attachments: #1 Attachment- Houston County Superior Court Order, #2 Attachment- Houston County Superior Court Order of Distribution, #3 Attachments- Earning Statements, #4 Envelope)(tam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROBERTS v. ADAMS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDGE G.E. "BO" ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBINS FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATLANTA POSTAL CREDIT UNION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARNER ROBINS POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOUSTON COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STACEY HASLEM ROBERTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?