WHITE v. MASSEE et al
Plaintiff: JULIUS WHITE
Defendant: SHERIFF BILL MASSEE, SERGEANT KITCHEN, LIEUTENANT GLENN, OFFICER EARL BRADLEY, NURSE EUBANK and OFFICER TOWE
Case Number: 5:2020cv00476
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Referring Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiffs Motions for Injunctions ( #5 and #6 ) are DEFERRED until Plaintiffs recast complaint is properly submitted to the Court because these appear to get into merits of claims and/or alternative claims. Plaintiff is ORDERED to complete and return a 42 U.S.C. 1983 complaint form and either pay the filing fee or seek leave to proceed in forma pauperis within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS of the date of this Order. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 02/12/2021. (vs)
January 27, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Filed by JULIUS WHITE. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(vs)
January 22, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Filed by JULIUS WHITE. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(vs)
January 4, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED #1 Complaint against All Defendants by JULIUS WHITE (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(vs)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tam)
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by JULIUS WHITE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(tam)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JULIUS WHITE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHITE v. MASSEE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERIFF BILL MASSEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERGEANT KITCHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIEUTENANT GLENN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER EARL BRADLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE EUBANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER TOWE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIUS WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?