JONES v. BREVILLE USA INC et al
Plaintiff: TODD MICHAEL JONES, JR
Defendant: BREVILLE USA INC and BREVILLE GROUP LIMITED
Case Number: 5:2020cv00488
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal by TODD MICHAEL JONES, JR as to BREVILLE GROUP LIMITED (CONLEY, CALE)
February 4, 2021 Filing 17 RULES 16/26 ORDER (as to Plaintiff and Defendant Breville USA Inc. only): Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 3/8/2021. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 2/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(kat)
January 28, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #9 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by BREVILLE USA INC, #13 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by BREVILLE GROUP LIMITED ); Each individual attorney must file their own Notice of Attorney Appearance. Only the attorney whose log-in credentials were used in filing the document is added to the case. NO NEED TO REFILE - for future reference only. Matthew G. Moffett added to case by the case manager.(ggs)
January 27, 2021 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BREVILLE GROUP LIMITED identifying Other Affiliate BREVILLE USA INC, Other Affiliate BREVILLE HOLDINGS USA, Other Affiliate THEBE INTERNATIONAL PTY for BREVILLE GROUP LIMITED. (PERNICIARO, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 1/28/2021 to edit docket text. (ggs).
January 27, 2021 Filing 15 Jurisdictional Statement by BREVILLE GROUP LIMITED (PERNICIARO, CHRISTOPHER)
January 27, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss the claims against BGL for lack of personal jurisdiction pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) by BREVILLE GROUP LIMITED filed by CHRISTOPHER PERNICIARO. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Martin Nicholas)(PERNICIARO, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 1/28/2021 to edit docket text. (ggs).
January 27, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by CHRISTOPHER PERNICIARO on behalf of BREVILLE GROUP LIMITED Attorney CHRISTOPHER PERNICIARO added to party BREVILLE GROUP LIMITED(pty:dft)(PERNICIARO, CHRISTOPHER)
January 27, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BREVILLE USA INC identifying Corporate Parent BREVILLE GROUP LIMITED, Corporate Parent BREVILLE HOLDINGS USA, Corporate Parent THEBE INTERNATIONAL PTY, Other Affiliate BARTAZA LLC for BREVILLE USA INC. (PERNICIARO, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 1/28/2021 to edit docket text. (ggs).
January 27, 2021 Filing 11 Jurisdictional Statement by BREVILLE USA INC (PERNICIARO, CHRISTOPHER)
January 27, 2021 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BREVILLE USA INC (PERNICIARO, CHRISTOPHER)
January 27, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by CHRISTOPHER PERNICIARO on behalf of BREVILLE USA INC (PERNICIARO, CHRISTOPHER)
January 27, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by BREVILLE USA INC with Jury Demand.(PERNICIARO, CHRISTOPHER)Attorney CHRISTOPHER PERNICIARO added to party BREVILLE USA INC(pty:dft)
January 19, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed/AFFIDAVIT of Service by TODD MICHAEL JONES, JR as to BREVILLE GROUP LIMITED. (CONLEY, CALE) Modified on 1/19/2021 (ggs).
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by KENNETH W PEARSON, ADAM J KRESS (Attachments: #1 PHV Admission) (nop)
January 12, 2021 Filing 5 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by TODD MICHAEL JONES, JR Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3679555, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Cale Conley, 181080. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(CONLEY, CALE)
January 12, 2021 Filing 4 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by TODD MICHAEL JONES, JR Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3679541, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Cale Conley, 181080. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(CONLEY, CALE)
December 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BREVILLE GROUP LIMITED. (ggs)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BREVILLE USA INC. (ggs)
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3668199, $402 filed by TODD MICHAEL JONES, JR (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consumer Product Safety Commission Recall Notice, #2 Exhibit B- Breville Fast-Slow Pro Pressure Cooker Owner's Manual, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Breville USA, Inc., #5 Summons Breville Group, Limited)(CONLEY, CALE)
December 30, 2020 This is a text only entry; no document issued.CASE TRANSFERRED TO Macon Pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 Statement. Case Number 5:2--cv-488 (tlf).
December 30, 2020 Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer to Case # 5:20-cv-488 (tlf).
December 30, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by TODD MICHAEL JONES, JR ); Notice to Counsel - DAVIS POPPER Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER.(ggs)
December 30, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL KENNETH W PEARSON, ADAM KRESS - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled.(ggs)
December 30, 2020 Case REASSIGNED to CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL. US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND no longer assigned to the case. (ggs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JONES v. BREVILLE USA INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BREVILLE USA INC
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER PERNICIARO
Represented By: MATTHEW G MOFFETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BREVILLE GROUP LIMITED
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER PERNICIARO
Represented By: MATTHEW G MOFFETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TODD MICHAEL JONES, JR
Represented By: CALE H CONLEY
Represented By: ADAM J KRESS
Represented By: DAVIS SHIRLEY POPPER
Represented By: KENNETH W PEARSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?