HOBBS v. MACE et al
Plaintiff: GENIE HOBBS
Defendant: HOUSTON COUNTY GEORGIA, JOHN DOES 1-3 and JIMMIE LEE MACE
Case Number: 5:2021cv00062
Filed: February 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by HOUSTON COUNTY GEORGIA, JIMMIE LEE MACE with Jury Demand.(ROLLINS, RALEIGH)
April 12, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES by HOUSTON COUNTY GEORGIA, JIMMIE LEE MACE (ROLLINS, RALEIGH)
March 26, 2021 Filing 5 RESPONSE filed by GENIE HOBBS re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Insurance )(POWELL, GARY)
March 8, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by HOUSTON COUNTY GEORGIA, JIMMIE LEE MACE filed by RALEIGH ROLLINS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS)(ROLLINS, RALEIGH)
February 24, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED/CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GENIE HOBBS re #2 Summons Issued (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(POWELL, GARY) Modified on 2/24/2021 to add docket text(vs).
February 18, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to HOUSTON COUNTY GEORGIA, JIMMIE LEE MACE. (Attachments: #1 Summons Jimmie Lee Mace)(vs)
February 18, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by GENIE HOBBS ); The PACER login ID and password used to electronically file a document constitutes the Participants electronic signature for all purposes under the Federal Rules. All electronically filed documents must include a signature block and must set forth the filers name, address, telephone number and e-mail address. The name on the document and the name associated with the participants login ID must be the same. NO NEED TO REFILE. (vs)
February 18, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by GENIE HOBBS ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE.(vs)
February 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3716833, $402 filed by Genie Hobbs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Def. Mace, #3 Summons Def. Houston County)(POWELL, GARY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOBBS v. MACE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENIE HOBBS
Represented By: GARY WAYNE POWELL
Represented By: Thomas J Ashenden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOUSTON COUNTY GEORGIA
Represented By: HENRY THOMAS SHAW
Represented By: RALEIGH ROLLINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIMMIE LEE MACE
Represented By: HENRY THOMAS SHAW
Represented By: RALEIGH ROLLINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?