GIBSON v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: FRANKIE LEE GIBSON and FRANKIE LYNN GIBSON
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Not Classified By Court: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Case Number: 5:2021cv00133
Filed: April 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Referring Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Filing 10 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Civil Process Clerk, #2 USM 285 ORCC)(tam)
May 5, 2021 Filing 9 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (tam)
May 3, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. All parties having consented pursuant to 28 USC 636(c)(1) for a full-time U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct any and all proceedings in connection with this action, including but not limited to, the trial of said case and the ordering of the entry of judgment herein; this case is hereby reassigned to US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE for all further proceedings. (mdm)
April 30, 2021 Filing 8 Consent to proceed before a full-time U.S. Magistrate Judge in accordance with the terms and conditions set forth in 28 U.S.C 636(c)(1) and (2) (OLINSKY, HOWARD)
April 22, 2021 Filing 7 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Attachments: #1 USM 285 ORCC, #2 USM 285 Attorney General)(tam)
April 22, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons Attorney General, #2 Summons ORCC)(tam)
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to FRANKIE LYNN GIBSON (tam)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tam)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H. WEIGLE on 4/21/21. (aob)
April 21, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by FRANKIE LEE GIBSON filed by HOWARD D OLINSKY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(OLINSKY, HOWARD)
April 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP) against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY filed by FRANKIE LEE GIBSON (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Letter to Clerk)(OLINSKY, HOWARD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GIBSON v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANKIE LEE GIBSON
Represented By: HOWARD D OLINSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANKIE LYNN GIBSON
Represented By: HOWARD D OLINSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?