DANIEL v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: AMANDA G DANIEL
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Not Classified By Court: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Case Number: 5:2021cv00203
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Referring Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2021 Filing 11 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (tam)
July 9, 2021 Filing 10 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Attorney General)(tam)
June 29, 2021 Filing 9 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (tam)
June 22, 2021 Filing 8 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Attachments: #1 USM 285 ORCC, #2 USM 285 Civil Process Clerk)(tam)
June 18, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons ORCC, #2 Summons Civil Process Clerk)(tam)
June 18, 2021 Filing 6 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Attachments: #1 USM 285 ORCC, #2 USM 285 Attorney General)(tam)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H. WEIGLE on 6/18/21. (aob)
June 18, 2021 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to AMANDA G DANIEL (tam)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tam)
June 18, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Amanda G Daniel filed by DARYL JAMES MORTON. (Attachments: #1 Required Form IFP motion application, #2 Summons). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(MORTON, DARYL)
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP) against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY filed by Amanda G Daniel (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MORTON, DARYL) Modified on 6/18/2021 to fix docket text (tam).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DANIEL v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMANDA G DANIEL
Represented By: DARYL JAMES MORTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?