CUMMINGS v. JORGE'S TIRE REPAIR LLC et al
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER CUMMINGS
Defendant: JORGE'S TIRE REPAIR LLC and JORGE SAMUDIO
Case Number: 5:2021cv00212
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED #1 Complaint, against All Defendants by CHRISTOPHER CUMMINGS (KASPERS, TYLER)
July 15, 2021 Filing 4 ***DISREGARD***ORDER Directing Service on Defendants Dr. HArris, Ms. Ramsey, Ms. Reno and Ms. Westfield. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 07/15/2021. (vs) Modified on 7/15/2021 to add docket text (vs).
July 15, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #4 Order Directing Service ); Case Administrator Deficiency. ***DISREGARD*** Order filed on the wrong case. (vs)
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by WHITNEY DUPREE on behalf of JORGE'S TIRE REPAIR LLC, JORGE SAMUDIO Attorney WHITNEY DUPREE added to party JORGE'S TIRE REPAIR LLC(pty:dft), Attorney WHITNEY DUPREE added to party JORGE SAMUDIO(pty:dft)(DUPREE, WHITNEY)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to JORGE'S TIRE REPAIR LLC, JORGE SAMUDIO. (Attachments: #1 Summons Jorge Samudio)(vs)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3830516, $402 filed by CHRISTOPHER CUMMINGS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opt-In Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(KASPERS, TYLER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CUMMINGS v. JORGE'S TIRE REPAIR LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JORGE'S TIRE REPAIR LLC
Represented By: WHITNEY DUPREE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JORGE SAMUDIO
Represented By: WHITNEY DUPREE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER CUMMINGS
Represented By: TYLER BRAND KASPERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?