MCCAIN v. GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Petitioner: RANSON KASHIF MCCAIN
Respondent: GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Case Number: 5:2021cv00238
Filed: July 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Referring Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Filing 16 JUDGMENT (ggs)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Petitioner's Petition is DISMISSED without prejudice. Petitioner is DENIED a COA. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 9/10/2021. (kat)
August 23, 2021 Filing 14 Mail Returned - #13 Order to Show Cause, sent to RANSON KASHIF MCCAIN returned as undeliverable. (Marked "Released") (ggs)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why his lawsuit should not be dismissed for failure to diligently prosecute this case by keeping the Court apprised of his mailing address. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 8/6/2021. (ggs)
July 26, 2021 Filing 12 Mail Returned - #11 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge sent to RANSON KASHIF MCCAIN returned as undeliverable. (ggs)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tam)
July 15, 2021 Filing 10 ***DISREGARD*** ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tam) Modified on 7/15/2021 to add docket text (tam).
July 15, 2021 Filing 9 Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-00865. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia, Macon Division, for further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 7/15/21. (jpa) [Transferred from gand on 7/15/2021.]
July 15, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ranson Kashif McCain re #8 Order. (jpa) [Transferred from gand on 7/15/2021.]
July 15, 2021 Case transferred electronically to the Middle District of Georgia, Macon Division. (jpa) [Transferred from gand on 7/15/2021.]
July 15, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly terminated from case. (jpa) [Transferred from gand on 7/15/2021.]
July 15, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL and US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE. (tam)
May 19, 2021 Submission of #7 Notice of Filing, #6 Order, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (jpa) [Transferred from gand on 7/15/2021.]
May 10, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE Of Filing Account Statement by Ranson Kashif McCain re #6 Order (jpa) [Transferred from gand on 7/15/2021.]
April 14, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ranson Kashif McCain re #6 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,. (jkb) [Transferred from gand on 7/15/2021.]
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner is ORDERED to either pay the $5.00 filing fee or submit an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days of the entry date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 04/13/2021. (jkb) [Transferred from gand on 7/15/2021.]
April 9, 2021 Submission of #5 MOTION for Extension of Time re: #3 Orderto Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (rlb) [Transferred from gand on 7/15/2021.]
April 8, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time re: #3 Order by Ranson Kashif McCain. (rlb) [Transferred from gand on 7/15/2021.]
March 11, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ranson Kashif McCain re #4 Notice (Other). (jpa) [Transferred from gand on 7/15/2021.]
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (dgs) (ADI) [Transferred from gand on 7/15/2021.]
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Petitioner to complete and submit the application within 30 days. Petitioner is cautioned that he must pay the full $5.00 filing fee for this case from his inmate account even if he is allowed to proceed in forma pauperis. The Court will order Petitioner's custodian to deduct, in monthly or other incremental installments, 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Petitioner's account, in each month in which the account balance exceeds $10.00, until the $5.00 filing fee is paid in full. If Petitioner does not want funds deducted from his inmate account, he should file a motion voluntarily dismissing this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 3/8/21. (jpa) [Transferred from gand on 7/15/2021.]
March 8, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ranson Kashif McCain re #3 Order and affidavit and authorization. (jpa) [Transferred from gand on 7/15/2021.]
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/27/21. (eop) [Transferred from gand on 7/15/2021.]
March 2, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ranson Kashif McCain re #2 Order. (eop) [Transferred from gand on 7/15/2021.]
March 2, 2021 Submission of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (eop) [Transferred from gand on 7/15/2021.]
March 1, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Ranson Kashif McCain. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from gand on 7/15/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCCAIN v. GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RANSON KASHIF MCCAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?