ROWNTREE et al v. GILBERT et al
Plaintiff: Zeta Rowntree, Chuck Robinson and Kristie Robinson
Defendant: Matt Gilbert, Three Oaks Development and Construction, Inc., Jones Land Developers, LLC, THREE OAKS DEVELOPMENT AND CONSTRUCTION INC and JONES LAND DEVELOPERS LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00255
Filed: July 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1319
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JOHN DENNIS CAREY on behalf of MATT GILBERT (CAREY, JOHN)
August 26, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Dennis Carey on behalf of MATT GILBERT Attorney John Dennis Carey added to party MATT GILBERT(pty:dft)(Carey, John)
August 26, 2021 Filing 10 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Jones Land Developers, LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by September 27, 2021. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 08/26/21 (mbw)
August 26, 2021 Filing 9 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Matt Gilbert and Three Oaks Development and Construction, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by September 27, 2021. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 08/26/21 (mbw)
August 26, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #11 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by MATT GILBERT ); Document must be converted into text-searchable PDF format and re-filed.(hdw)
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by JONES LAND DEVELOPERS LLC filed by Carl H. Anderson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Exhibit "A" to Consent Motion for Extension of Time)(Anderson, Carl)
August 25, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by MATT GILBERT, THREE OAKS DEVELOPMENT AND CONSTRUCTION INC filed by TRAVIS SHANE MAYES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Consent Order)(MAYES, TRAVIS)
August 25, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by TRAVIS SHANE MAYES on behalf of MATT GILBERT, THREE OAKS DEVELOPMENT AND CONSTRUCTION INC Attorney TRAVIS SHANE MAYES added to party MATT GILBERT(pty:dft), Attorney TRAVIS SHANE MAYES added to party THREE OAKS DEVELOPMENT AND CONSTRUCTION INC(pty:dft)(MAYES, TRAVIS)
August 25, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ERIC FOSTER on behalf of MATT GILBERT, THREE OAKS DEVELOPMENT AND CONSTRUCTION INC Attorney ERIC FOSTER added to party MATT GILBERT(pty:dft), Attorney ERIC FOSTER added to party THREE OAKS DEVELOPMENT AND CONSTRUCTION INC(pty:dft)(FOSTER, ERIC)
August 16, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CHUCK ROBINSON, KRISTIE ROBINSON, ZETA ROWNTREE (STACK, DONALD)
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 EXHIBIT(S) to Dkt 1 Complaint by CHUCK ROBINSON, KRISTIE ROBINSON, ZETA ROWNTREE re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - 60 day notice of intent to Sue, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - 60 day notice of intent to sue 1-27-21, #3 Exhibit Verification of Zeta Rowntree, #4 Exhibit Verification of Chuck and Kristie Robinson)(STACK, DONALD)
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons THREE OAKS DEVELOPMENT AND CONSTRUCTION INC, #2 Summons JONES LAND DEVELOPERS LLC)(hdw)
July 22, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by Kristie Robinson, Chuck Robinson, Zeta Rowntree ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE.(hdw)
July 22, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by Kristie Robinson, Chuck Robinson, Zeta Rowntree ); Document must be re-filed to include a description of exhibit(s). Exhibits must be refiled via CM/ECF > Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Exhibit. Link this filing to #1 Complaint. (hdw)
July 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3850426, $402 filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(STACK, DONALD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROWNTREE et al v. GILBERT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zeta Rowntree
Represented By: DONALD D J STACK
Represented By: GEORGE LOTT
Represented By: JACLYN BRASS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chuck Robinson
Represented By: DONALD D J STACK
Represented By: GEORGE LOTT
Represented By: JACLYN BRASS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristie Robinson
Represented By: DONALD D J STACK
Represented By: GEORGE LOTT
Represented By: JACLYN BRASS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Gilbert
Represented By: ERIC FOSTER
Represented By: JOHN DENNIS CAREY
Represented By: TRAVIS SHANE MAYES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three Oaks Development and Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones Land Developers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THREE OAKS DEVELOPMENT AND CONSTRUCTION INC
Represented By: ERIC FOSTER
Represented By: TRAVIS SHANE MAYES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONES LAND DEVELOPERS LLC
Represented By: CARL H ANDERSON, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?