TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA v. WOODARD
Plaintiff: TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Defendant: RAYMOND DANE WOODARD
Case Number: 5:2021cv00308
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE filed by TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA re #7 MOTION to Stay Civil Action 5:21-cv-00308 pending outcome of Criminal Action (LOOMIS, GASTON)
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay Civil Action 5:21-cv-00308 pending outcome of Criminal Action by RAYMOND DANE WOODARD filed by BRITTANY E BENNETT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Indictment in Parallel Criminal Action)(BENNETT, BRITTANY)
September 21, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #6 Answer to Complaint filed by RAYMOND DANE WOODARD ); The signature block does not include the telephone number of the filer as required by page 7 of the CM/ECF procedures manual. NO NEED TO REFILE - for future reference only that the filer's address, telephone number and e-mail address must be included in the signature block.(ggs)
September 15, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by RAYMOND DANE WOODARD with Jury Demand.(BENNETT, BRITTANY)Attorney BRITTANY E BENNETT added to party RAYMOND DANE WOODARD(pty:dft)
September 8, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA as to RAYMOND DANE WOODARD. (LOOMIS, GASTON)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 Jurisdictional Statement by TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA (LOOMIS, GASTON)
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA identifying Corporate Parent TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY, Corporate Parent TRAVELERS INSURANCE GROUP HOLDINGS INC, Corporate Parent THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES INC, Corporate Parent TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY CORP for TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA. (LOOMIS, GASTON)
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to RAYMOND DANE WOODARD. (ggs)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RAYMOND DANE WOODARD Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3879119, $402 filed by TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Release and Assignment)(LOOMIS, GASTON)
August 24, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed.(ggs)
August 24, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately.(ggs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA v. WOODARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: GASTON P LOOMIS, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAYMOND DANE WOODARD
Represented By: BRITTANY E BENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?