SEGRETO v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: Jennifer Segreto
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Case Number: 5:2021cv00323
Filed: September 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Referring Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Filing 10 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (tam)
September 9, 2021 Filing 9 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Attachments: #1 USM 285 ORCC, #2 USM 285 Civil Process Clerk)(tam)
September 7, 2021 Filing 8 Consent to proceed before a full-time U.S. Magistrate Judge in accordance with the terms and conditions set forth in 28 U.S.C 636(c)(1) and (2) (YAZINSKI, EDWARD)
September 7, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #8 Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge filed by JENNIFER SEGRETO ); For future filings all documents must be converted into text-searchable PDF format. NO NEED TO REFILE. (tam)
September 7, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. All parties having consented pursuant to 28 USC 636(c)(1) for a full-time U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct any and all proceedings in connection with this action, including but not limited to, the trial of said case and the ordering of the entry of judgment herein; this case is hereby reassigned to US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE for all further proceedings. (tam)
September 3, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons Civil Process Clerk, #2 Summons ORCC)(tam)
September 3, 2021 Filing 6 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Civil Process Clerk, #2 USM 285 ORCC)(tam)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H. WEIGLE on 09/03/2021. (dnl)
September 3, 2021 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to JENNIFER SEGRETO (tam)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tam)
September 3, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint (IFP) filed by Jennifer Segreto ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE.(tam)
September 2, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jennifer Segreto filed by EDWARD J YAZINSKI. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit application for IFP, #2 Summons Regional office, #3 Summons attorney general, #4 Summons civil process clerk, #5 Proposed Order IFP). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(YAZINSKI, EDWARD)
September 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP) against Jennifer Segreto filed by Jennifer Segreto (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(YAZINSKI, EDWARD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SEGRETO v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Segreto
Represented By: EDWARD J YAZINSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?