ALFA INSURANCE CORPORATION v. GILBERT et al
Plaintiff: ALFA INSURANCE CORPORATION
Defendant: MATT GILBERT, THREE OAKS DEVELOPMENT AND CONSTRUCTION INC, JONES LAND DEVELOPERS LLC, ZETA ROWNTREE, CHUCK ROBINSON, KRISTIE ROBINSON and THREE OAKS CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT INC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00358
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to MATT GILBERT, JONES LAND DEVELOPERS LLC, THREE OAKS CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT INC - Plaintiff shall file a motion for default judgment within 21 days. The motion for default judgment shall state whether a hearing is necessary to determine damages, and if a hearing is not necessary, the motion shall include all evidence supporting the damages sought in the motion and a proposed order granting the motion. Failure to comply with this notice may result in this action being dismissed for failure to prosecute. (hdw)
November 24, 2021 Filing 19 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against JONES LAND DEVELOPERS LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Default)(BLEDSOE, JONATHAN)
November 24, 2021 Filing 18 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against MATT GILBERT (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Default)(BLEDSOE, JONATHAN)
November 24, 2021 Filing 17 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against THREE OAKS CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT INC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Default)(BLEDSOE, JONATHAN)
November 24, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY to Response filed by ALFA INSURANCE CORPORATION re #5 MOTION to Stay Underlying Action (BLEDSOE, JONATHAN)
November 18, 2021 Filing 15 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 12/20/2021. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 11/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(kat)
November 17, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE Notice of Filing Verifications by CHUCK ROBINSON, KRISTIE ROBINSON, ZETA ROWNTREE (STACK, DONALD)
November 11, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE filed by CHUCK ROBINSON, KRISTIE ROBINSON, ZETA ROWNTREE re #5 MOTION to Stay Underlying Action (STACK, DONALD)
November 11, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by CHUCK ROBINSON, KRISTIE ROBINSON, ZETA ROWNTREE with Jury Demand.(STACK, DONALD)Attorney DONALD D J STACK added to party CHUCK ROBINSON(pty:dft), Attorney DONALD D J STACK added to party KRISTIE ROBINSON(pty:dft), Attorney DONALD D J STACK added to party ZETA ROWNTREE(pty:dft)
October 26, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALFA INSURANCE CORPORATION as to ZETA ROWNTREE. (BLEDSOE, JONATHAN)
October 26, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALFA INSURANCE CORPORATION as to THREE OAKS CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT INC. (BLEDSOE, JONATHAN)
October 26, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALFA INSURANCE CORPORATION as to MATT GILBERT. (BLEDSOE, JONATHAN)
October 26, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALFA INSURANCE CORPORATION as to KRISTIE ROBINSON. (BLEDSOE, JONATHAN)
October 26, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALFA INSURANCE CORPORATION as to JONES LAND DEVELOPERS LLC. (BLEDSOE, JONATHAN)
October 26, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALFA INSURANCE CORPORATION as to CHUCK ROBINSON. (BLEDSOE, JONATHAN)
October 15, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay Underlying Action by ALFA INSURANCE CORPORATION filed by JONATHAN L BLEDSOE. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief in Support of Motion to Stay)(BLEDSOE, JONATHAN)
October 15, 2021 Filing 4 Jurisdictional Statement by ALFA INSURANCE CORPORATION (BLEDSOE, JONATHAN)
October 14, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MATT GILBERT, JONES LAND DEVELOPERS LLC, CHUCK ROBINSON, KRISTIE ROBINSON, ZETA ROWNTREE, THREE OAKS CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT INC. Main Document: Summons MATT GILBERT. (Attachments: #1 Summons THREE OAKS CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT INC, #2 Summons JONES LAND DEVELOPERS LLC, #3 Summons ZETA ROWNTREE, #4 Summons CHUCK ROBINSON, #5 Summons KRISTIE ROBINSON)(ggs)
October 14, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALFA INSURANCE CORPORATION identifying Corporate Parent ALFA INSURANCE CORPORATION, Corporate Parent ALFA CORPORATION for ALFA INSURANCE CORPORATION. (BLEDSOE, JONATHAN)
October 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MATT GILBERT, JONES LAND DEVELOPERS LLC, CHUCK ROBINSON, KRISTIE ROBINSON, ZETA ROWNTREE, THREE OAKS DEVELOPMENT AND CONSTRUCTION INC Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3922507, $402 filed by ALFA INSURANCE CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Underlying Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: 60-Day Notice of Intent to Sue and Demand to Abate Nuisance and Trespass Letter, #3 Exhibit C: Notice of Loss, #4 Exhibit D: Homeowners Policy, #5 Exhibit E: Umbrella Policy, #6 Exhibit F: Reservation of Rights, #7 Exhibit G: Homeowners Policy Declaration Pages, #8 Exhibit H: Umbrella Policy Declaration Page, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons: Matt Gilbert, #11 Summons: Three Oaks Construction and Development, Inc, #12 Summons: Jones Land Developers, LLC, #13 Summons: Zeta Rowntree, #14 Summons: Chuck Robinson, #15 Summons: Kristie Robinson)(BLEDSOE, JONATHAN) Modified on 10/14/2021 to edit text. (ggs).
October 14, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by ALFA INSURANCE CORPORATION ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. Please note that this is a separate filing not to be combined with the corporate disclosure statement using the event "Jurisdictional Statement."(ggs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALFA INSURANCE CORPORATION v. GILBERT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALFA INSURANCE CORPORATION
Represented By: JONATHAN L BLEDSOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATT GILBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THREE OAKS DEVELOPMENT AND CONSTRUCTION INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONES LAND DEVELOPERS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZETA ROWNTREE
Represented By: DONALD D J STACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHUCK ROBINSON
Represented By: DONALD D J STACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRISTIE ROBINSON
Represented By: DONALD D J STACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THREE OAKS CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?