FIRST SOLAR ELECTRIC LLC v. ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: First Solar Electric, LLC and FIRST SOLAR ELECTRIC LLC
Defendant: ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2021cv00408
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Filing 18 Request for Rule Local 6.2 Clerk's Extension re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6) by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY (BURKE, KAMBER)
December 27, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE Request for Clerk's Extension ot Time for Reply Brief by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY re #16 Response to Motion (BURKE, KAMBER)
December 27, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #17 Notice (Other) filed by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ); Document must be re-filed using correct event which is "Request for Local Rule 6.2 Clerk's Extension" located under "Other Filings" - "Other Documents."(ggs)
December 27, 2021 Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension Pursuant to Local Rule 6.2 re: #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6) filed by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY (ggs)
December 23, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE filed by FIRST SOLAR ELECTRIC LLC re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6) (MIDDLETON, F)
December 16, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by KAMBER STEFANY BURKE on behalf of ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY Attorney KAMBER STEFANY BURKE added to party ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:dft)(BURKE, KAMBER)
December 8, 2021 Notice of Deficiency; No need to re-file; Related document: #12 Memorandum in Support, filed by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY; Document should not have been filed as a stand-alone filing, but rather as an attachment to the motion to which it relates. Please see CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, Page 14 (tlf).
December 7, 2021 Filing 14 Jurisdictional Statement by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY (MORRIS, ANTHONY)
December 7, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY LTD, Corporate Parent ZURICH INSURANCE GROUP LTD, Corporate Parent ZURICH HOLDING COMPANY OF AMERICA INC for ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (MORRIS, ANTHONY)
December 7, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY re: #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter 08.04.2020, #2 Exhibit B - Letter 03.22.2021, #3 Exhibit C - Letter 05.10.2021)(MORRIS, ANTHONY)
December 7, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6) by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY filed by ANTHONY WYATT MORRIS.(MORRIS, ANTHONY)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by EMILY M RUZIC. (mdm)
December 1, 2021 Filing 9 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by FIRST SOLAR ELECTRIC LLC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3960016, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: F. Faison Middleton IV No. 504745. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(RUZIC, EMILY)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by ALEX PURVIS. (mdm)
November 30, 2021 Filing 7 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by FIRST SOLAR ELECTRIC LLC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3958751, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: F. Faison Middleton IV, GA Bar No. 504745. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(PURVIS, ALEX)
November 17, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FIRST SOLAR ELECTRIC LLC as to ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (MIDDLETON, F)
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Hunley Monk, III on behalf of FIRST SOLAR ELECTRIC LLC Attorney Richard Hunley Monk, III added to party FIRST SOLAR ELECTRIC LLC(pty:pla)(Monk, Richard)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (ggs)
November 15, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by First Solar Electric, LLC ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The attorney case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Please do not re-file, corrected by case manager.(ggs)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 Jurisdictional Statement by First Solar Electric, LLC (MIDDLETON, F)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by First Solar Electric, LLC identifying Corporate Parent First Solar Electric, LLC, Other Affiliate First Solar, Inc. for First Solar Electric, LLC. (MIDDLETON, F)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3947151, $402 filed by First Solar Electric, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - 2018 Press Release, #3 Exhibit C - Certificate, #4 Exhibit D - Checks, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)(MIDDLETON, F)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FIRST SOLAR ELECTRIC LLC v. ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Solar Electric, LLC
Represented By: F FAISON MIDDLETON, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIRST SOLAR ELECTRIC LLC
Represented By: ALEX PURVIS
Represented By: EMILY M RUZIC
Represented By: RICHARD HUNLEY MONK, III
Represented By: F FAISON MIDDLETON, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: ANTHONY WYATT MORRIS
Represented By: KAMBER STEFANY BURKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?