WILSON v. PERRY et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL DAVID WILSON, JR
Defendant: WARDEN CLINTON PERRY, JESSICA DEAN, LACHAKA MCKENZIE, PETER EDDIE, C MARTIN and STREETER
Case Number: 5:2021cv00457
Filed: December 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Referring Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time; denying #8 Motion for Discovery Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 2/9/2022. (tam)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Discovery Filed by MICHAEL DAVID WILSON, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(tam)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Pay the $402.00 Filing Fee. re #6 Order. Filed by MICHAEL DAVID WILSON, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(tam) Modified on 1/27/2022 to add docket text (tam).
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff is ORDERED to pay the full filing fee of $402.00. Plaintiff shall have FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date shown on this Order to pay the required filing fee to the Clerk of Court. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 1/10/2022. (ggs)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, Filed by MICHAEL DAVID WILSON, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(tam)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (ggs)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Filed by MICHAEL DAVID WILSON. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(ggs)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by MICHAEL DAVID WILSON. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(ggs)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by MICHAEL DAVID WILSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 and 1B - Grievance 6/6/2019, #2 Exhibit 2 - note re: grievance dated 6/6/2019 and approval of person for visitation, #3 Exhibit 3 - Counselor Request Form dated 7/29/2019, #4 Exhibit 4 - Counselor Request Form dated 7/30/2019, #5 Exhibit 5 - Letter to Ms. Streeter 8/26/2019, #6 Exhibit 6 - Leter to Ms. Streeter 9/10/2019, #7 Exhibit 7 - Letter to Office of Professional Standard 9/10/2019, #8 Exhibit 8A and 8B - Letter to Ms. Williams and Counselor Request Form dated 8/27/2019, #9 Exhibit 9 - Letter to Chief Counselor Jeffrie dated 1/8/2020, #10 Exhibit 10 - Letter to Plaintiff from C. Martin 5/21/2018, #11 Exhibit 11 - Letter from ACLU received 3/20/2020, #12 Exhibit 12 - Letter to Whome It May Concern, #13 Envelope)(ggs)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE RE FILING IN PROPER DIVISION: Your documents were sent to a division other than the division where your case is pending. Although not required, in order to expedite filing we recommend you send documents to the division where your case is pending. Please send all future documents to: U.S. District Court, P. O. Box 128, Macon GA 31202.(ggs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILSON v. PERRY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL DAVID WILSON, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARDEN CLINTON PERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESSICA DEAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LACHAKA MCKENZIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER EDDIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STREETER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?