LYNCH v. WARD et al
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA ALICIA LYNCH
Defendant: TIMOTHY C WARD, SHARON M LEWIS, Javel Jackson and AHMED HOLT
Case Number: 5:2021cv00461
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2022 Filing 9 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Lynch paid her filing fee in full. Accordingly, her motion to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 1/25/22. (bwr)
January 21, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE Notice of Fee Payment by CHRISTINA ALICIA LYNCH (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Filing Fee Receipt)(FOSTER, CHARLES)
January 19, 2022 Filing fee Paid: IFP Denied $402 AGAMDC-3995000 (hdw)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by CHRISTINA ALICIA LYNCH. Lynch is ORDERED to submit a proper motion to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee, which should include a certified copy of her trust fund account statement. The Clerk is DIRECTED to provide Lynch's counsel with a copy of the appropriate forms for this purpose. Lynch shall have 20 days from the date shown on this Order to comply. If Lynch does not timely and fully comply with this Order, this action will be dismissed. There shall be no service of process in this case until further order of the Court. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 1/4/2022. (kat)
January 4, 2022 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #6 Summons Issued ); Case Administrator Deficiency. Summons issued prematurely. Motion to proceed in forma pauperis has not bee ruled on. (hdw)
January 3, 2022 Filing 6 ***Disregard*** Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Jackson, #2 Summons Lewis, #3 Summons Ward)(hdw) Modified on 1/4/2022 (hdw).
January 3, 2022 Filing 5 COMPLAINT (IFP) against All Defendants filed by CHRISTINA ALICIA LYNCH (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Lynch v Ward Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Lynch- Summons to Hold, #3 Summons Lynch- Summons to Jackson, #4 Summons Lynch- Summons to Lewis, #5 Summons Lynch- Summons to Ward)(FOSTER, CHARLES)
January 3, 2022 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #5 Complaint (IFP), filed by CHRISTINA ALICIA LYNCH ); Notice to Counsel CHARLES FOSTER. The e mail address on the document does not match your e mail address in CM/ECF. If necessary, please update your e mail address via PACER.(hdw)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CHRISTINA ALICIA LYNCH filed by CHARLES FOSTER.(FOSTER, CHARLES)
December 29, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT (IFP) against All Defendants filed by CHRISTINA ALICIA LYNCH (FOSTER, CHARLES)
December 29, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #3 Complaint (IFP) filed by CHRISTINA ALICIA LYNCH, #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by CHRISTINA ALICIA LYNCH ); Documents must be re-filed. Civil Cover Sheet needs to be a separate attachment to Complaint. Summons need to be separate attachments to Complaint. The e mail address on the Complaint does not match your e mail address in CM/ECF. If necessary, please update your e mail address via PACER. ***Spoke with Attorney and directed them to the Middle District of Georgia website CM/ECF Information Tab where Attorney Case Opening Guide is located. Also recommend looking at the Local Rules located on the main page of Middle District of Georgia website.*** (hdw)
December 28, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint (IFP) filed by CHRISTINA ALICIA LYNCH ); Document must be re-filed to include a description of attachment(s). A generic identifier such as Exhibit A or Exhibit 1 is not acceptable. An example of a properly identified attachment would be Exhibit A Letter from A. Hamilton to A. Burr. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, page 13.(hdw)
December 28, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 MOTION attached to Complaint (IFP) filed by CHRISTINA ALICIA LYNCH ); Document must be re-filed using correct event which is Motion.The PACER login ID and password used to electronically file a document constitutes the Participants electronic signature for all purposes under the Federal Rules. Document must be re-filed using the user credentials of the name of the attorney in the signature block. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, page 7. ***Motion is not signed by Attorney***(hdw)
December 28, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint (IFP) filed by CHRISTINA ALICIA LYNCH ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The attorney case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Please do not re-file, corrected by case manager.(hdw)
December 28, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #2 Affidavit filed by CHRISTINA ALICIA LYNCH ); Document must be re-filed using correct event which is Motion.(hdw)
December 28, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #2 Affidavit filed by CHRISTINA ALICIA LYNCH ); Document must be re-filed to include a description of attachment(s). A generic identifier such as Exhibit A or Exhibit 1 is not acceptable. An example of a properly identified attachment would be Exhibit A Letter from A. Hamilton to A. Burr. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, page 13.(hdw)
December 27, 2021 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint (IFP) Pauper's Affidavit and Summonses by CHRISTINA ALICIA LYNCH (FOSTER, CHARLES)
December 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP) against All Defendants filed by CHRISTINA ALICIA LYNCH (FOSTER, CHARLES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LYNCH v. WARD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA ALICIA LYNCH
Represented By: CHARLES FOSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY C WARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHARON M LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javel Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHMED HOLT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?