HANKINS v. UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: Ricko Hankins
Defendant: UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2022cv00072
Filed: February 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Default Judgment as to. by RICKO HANKINS filed by PAUL R AYERBE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Affidavit of Ricko Hankins, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Stamped Complaint for Damages, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C- Affidavit of Paul R. Ayerbe, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D- Sheriff's Entry of Service, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E- Affidavit of Audrey Cowart)(AYERBE, PAUL)
March 29, 2022 Filing 5 Letter to counsel from David W. Bunt, Clerk regarding Default Judgment under Rule 55(b)(1). (vs)
March 29, 2022 Filing 4 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Plaintiff's file stamped Complaint for Damages, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Sheriff's Entry of Service, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C- Affidavit of Paul R. Ayerbe)(AYERBE, PAUL)
March 29, 2022 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY - Plaintiff shall file a motion for default judgment within 21 days. The motion for default judgment shall state whether a hearing is necessary to determine damages, and if a hearing is not necessary, the motion shall include all evidence supporting the damages sought in the motion and a proposed order granting the motion. Failure to comply with this notice may result in this action being dismissed for failure to prosecute. (vs)
March 29, 2022 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #3 Motion for Entry of Default, filed by RICKO HANKINS ); Document must be re-filed using correct event which is Application to Clerk for Entry of Default.(vs)
March 28, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Requesting Entry of Default and Default Judgment Against Defendant by RICKO HANKINS filed by PAUL R AYERBE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Plaintiff's file stamped Complaint for Damages, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Sheriff's Entry of Service, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C- Affidavit of Paul R. Ayerbe)(AYERBE, PAUL)
February 16, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (vs)
February 16, 2022 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by RICKO HANKINS ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The attorney case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Please do not re-file, corrected by case manager.(vs)
February 16, 2022 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by RICKO HANKINS ); The signature block does not include the e mail address of the filer. Please do not re-file, for future reference only. See Fed.R.Civ.P 11.(vs)
February 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4017615, $402 filed by Ricko Hankins (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons for Defendant United States Fire Ins Co)(AYERBE, PAUL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HANKINS v. UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricko Hankins
Represented By: PAUL R AYERBE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?