RIDLEY v. FORT et al
Plaintiff: EDWARD TYRONE RIDLEY
Defendant: KARL FORT, TIMOTHY C WARD and GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Case Number: 5:2022cv00159
Filed: April 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Referring Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT by EDWARD TYRONE RIDLEY (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tam)
May 19, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File to Submit Grievance #334949 as Evidence Filed by EDWARD TYRONE RIDLEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Central Office Appeal Response, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(tam)
May 19, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Add Defendants and Issue Subpoenas Filed by EDWARD TYRONE RIDLEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supreme Court of Georgia Docketing Letter, #2 Exhibit Supreme Court of Georgia Order, #3 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(tam)
May 3, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Submit Attached Returned Letter as Evidence Filed by EDWARD TYRONE RIDLEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Mail, #2 Exhibit Amended Petition, #3 Envelope)(tam)
May 3, 2022 Case ASSIGNED to US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE.. Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(tam)
April 25, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, TIMOTHY C WARD, KARL FORT Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4072908, $402 filed by GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, TIMOTHY C WARD, KARL FORT (Attachments: #1 Removal Documents Attachment 1 - Washington County Superior Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) All parties must refile pending motions from the court of origin in this new case.(CUSIMANO, ANGELA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RIDLEY v. FORT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD TYRONE RIDLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KARL FORT
Represented By: ANGELA ELLEN CUSIMANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY C WARD
Represented By: ANGELA ELLEN CUSIMANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: ANGELA ELLEN CUSIMANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?