DEBIASI v. CARDINAL PIZZA, LLC
Plaintiff: JOSEPH DEBIASI
Defendant: CARDINAL PIZZA LLC
Case Number: 5:2022cv00294
Filed: August 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to CARDINAL PIZZA LLC. (vs)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by JOSH SANFORD (tam)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by WILLIAM PATRICK WILSON (tam)
August 26, 2022 Filing 6 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by JOSEPH DEBIASI Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4170543, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Matthew W. Herrington 275411. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(SANFORD, JOSH)
August 26, 2022 Filing 5 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by JOSEPH DEBIASI Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4170527, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Matthew W. Herrington 275411. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(WILSON, WILLIAM)
August 26, 2022 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #5 Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice, filed by JOSEPH DEBIASI ); Notice to Counsel (WILLIAM PATRICK WILSON). The e mail address on the document does not match your e mail address in CM/ECF. If necessary, please update your e mail address via PACER.(tam)
August 25, 2022 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #4 Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice, filed by JOSEPH DEBIASI, #3 Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice, filed by JOSEPH DEBIASI ); The PACER login ID and password used to electronically file a document constitutes the Participants electronic signature for all purposes under the Federal Rules. Document must be re-filed using the user credentials of the name of the attorney in the signature block. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, page 7. Other (you must obtain a Certificate of Good Standing from a US District Court where you are admitted to practice. (The Certificate must be issued within 30 days of petition for admission.) (tam)
August 15, 2022 Filing 4 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by JOSEPH DEBIASI Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4159805, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Matthew Herrington GA Bar Number 275411. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(HERRINGTON, MATTHEW)
August 15, 2022 Filing 3 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by JOSEPH DEBIASI Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4159788, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Matthew Herrington GA Bar Number 275411. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(HERRINGTON, MATTHEW)
August 11, 2022 Filing 2 Consent to Join Action (FLSA). (HERRINGTON, MATTHEW)
August 11, 2022 NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Patrick Wilson and Josh Sanford - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements.(vs)
August 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cardinal Pizza, LLC Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4155725, $402 filed by Joseph Debiasi (Attachments: #1 Consent to Join Collective Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to Cardinal Pizza, LLC)(HERRINGTON, MATTHEW)
August 10, 2022 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by JOSEPH DEBIASI ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The attorney case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Please do not re-file, corrected by case manager.(vs)
August 10, 2022 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): Attachment #1 Consent to Join Collective Action, filed by JOSEPH DEBIASI ); Document must be re-filed using correct event which is Consent to Join Action (FLSA) - Civil Events Other Filings Other Documents.(vs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEBIASI v. CARDINAL PIZZA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH DEBIASI
Represented By: MATTHEW W HERRINGTON
Represented By: JOSH SANFORD
Represented By: WILLIAM PATRICK WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARDINAL PIZZA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?