ZAHAROPOULOS v. METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: NIKOLAOS ZAHAROPOULOS
Defendant: NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION GROUP BENEFITS PLAN
3Rd Party Plaintiff: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
3Rd Party Defendant: NASIR TAYLOR and JC
Case Number: 5:2022cv00348
Filed: September 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim,, ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, by JC with Jury Demand.(KARRH, HEATHER)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Discharge; granting #25 Motion to Dismiss Party; granting #25 Motion for Permanent Injunction. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 11/21/2022. (ggs)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CONSENT MOTION for Discharge, MOTION to Dismiss Party METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY(, ), MOTION for Permanent Injunction(, ) by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY filed by AARON EDWARD POHLMANN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Consent Order))(POHLMANN, AARON)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #23 Summons Issued, #6 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, Acknowledgment filed by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (POHLMANN, AARON)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #24 Acknowledgment of Service filed by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ); Documents must be converted into text-searchable PDF format prior to filing. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, page 9. No need to refile, for future reference only.(ggs)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #24 Acknowledgment of Service filed by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ); The signature block does not include the e mail address of the filer. Please do not re-file, for future reference only. See Fed.R.Civ.P 11.(ggs)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Summons Issued as to JC. (ggs)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad litem ad Litem. Appointed HEATHER K KARRH for minor Third-Party Defendant JC. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 11/10/2022. (ggs) Modified on 11/10/2022 to edit text. (ggs).
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CONSENT MOTION to Appoint of Guardian ad Litem by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY filed by AARON EDWARD POHLMANN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Consent Order))(POHLMANN, AARON)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim,, ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, by NIKOLAOS ZAHAROPOULOS.(BROWN, DUSTIN)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order DEPOSIT of Funds into Registry in the amount of $486,063.56, receipt number 500000724; deposited by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (vs)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION of Dismissal by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY as to NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION GROUP BENEFITS PLAN (POHLMANN, AARON)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by NASIR TAYLOR.(GRANT, THOMAS)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by THOMAS GRANT on behalf of NASIR TAYLOR Attorney THOMAS GRANT added to party NASIR TAYLOR(pty:3pd)(GRANT, THOMAS)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order SECOND NOTICE of Deficiency (related document(s): #14 Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice, filed by NASIR TAYLOR ); Local Counsel THOMAS C. GRANT must file an notice of attorney appearance in this case immediately./(ggs)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Administrative Record)(POHLMANN, AARON)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by MICHAEL HOOVER (nop)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #14 Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice, filed by NASIR TAYLOR ); Local Counsel THOMAS C. GRANT must file an notice of attorney appearance in this case as soon as possible.(ggs)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by NASIR TAYLOR Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4213945, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Thomas C. Grant 297455. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(HOOVER, MICHAEL)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 Consent Motion to Deposit Funds. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 10/24/2022. (kat)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT MOTION to Deposit Funds by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY filed by AARON EDWARD POHLMANN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(POHLMANN, AARON)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY as to NASIR TAYLOR. (POHLMANN, AARON)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. The Plaintiff seeks to recover ERISA benefits pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 1132(a)(1)(B). The Court thus recognizes that no or only minimal discovery may be necessary because the case will be decided on the administrative record. Accordingly, the Defendant shall file the administrative record within thirty days of the entry of this Order. When citing to the administrative record, the Parties shall refer to CM/ECF pagination, e.g., (Doc. 23-2 at 27). Once the administrative record is filed, the Court will enter an Order setting forth the date by which dispositive motions are due.However, if all Parties agree that additional discovery is necessary, they shall promptly inform the Court of that agreement, and the Court will enter its standard Rule 16/26 Scheduling Order. If fewer than all Parties contend discovery is necessary, those Parties shall submit a Memorandum within fourteen days of the entry of this Order addressing why discovery is necessary. Responses shall be filed within fourteen days. Replies shall be filed within seven days. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 10/20/2022. (kat)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #7 Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice, filed by NIKOLAOS ZAHAROPOULOS ); Documents must be converted into text-searchable PDF format prior to filing. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, page 9. Please do not refile, for future reference only.(ggs) Modified on 10/20/2022 to edit text. (ggs).
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #11 Waiver of Service Executed filed by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ); Documents must be converted into text-searchable PDF format prior to filing. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, page 9. Please do not refile, for future reference only.(ggs)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent METLIFE INC for METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (POHLMANN, AARON)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by M CLAYBORN WILLIAMS (nop)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by NIKOLAOS ZAHAROPOULOS Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4210586, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Dustin T. Brown 193752. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(WILLIAMS, M)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, (), THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against NIKOLAOS ZAHAROPOULOS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Administrative Record), COUNTERCLAIM against NIKOLAOS ZAHAROPOULOS by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Administrative Record)(POHLMANN, AARON)Attorney AARON EDWARD POHLMANN added to party METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:dft)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #6 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim, filed by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ); All nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. See Local Rule 87.1.(ggs)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NIKOLAOS ZAHAROPOULOS as to METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (BROWN, DUSTIN)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Certified Receipt executed) by NIKOLAOS ZAHAROPOULOS as to NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION GROUP BENEFITS PLAN. (BROWN, DUSTIN) Modified on 10/4/2022 (ggs).
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION GROUP BENEFITS PLAN. (ggs)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (ggs)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4190267, $402 filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons-Def Metropolitan LIC, #3 Summons Summons-The Northrop Grumman Corp Group Benefits Plan, #4 Exhibit Exh 1-MetLife Policy and Certificate, #5 Exhibit Exh 2-April 2022 Denial Letter, #6 Exhibit Exh 3-May 2022 Letter Upholding Decision on Appeal)(BROWN, DUSTIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZAHAROPOULOS v. METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NIKOLAOS ZAHAROPOULOS
Represented By: DUSTIN T BROWN
Represented By: MILES CLAYBORN WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: AARON EDWARD POHLMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION GROUP BENEFITS PLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: NASIR TAYLOR
Represented By: THOMAS GRANT
Represented By: MICHAEL HOOVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: JC
Represented By: HEATHER K KARRH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?