NATIONAL TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY et al v. MACON MACHINE INC et al
Plaintiff: NATIONAL TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY and FCCI INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: MACON MACHINE INC, MIDSTATE STEEL INC, SYLVIA ELLIS, FREDDIE GRAHAM and JANET GRAHAM
Case Number: 5:2023cv00121
Filed: April 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2023 Filing 23 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 7/3/2023. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 6/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(kat)
June 1, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by MICHAEL J SULLIVAN on behalf of MACON MACHINE INC, MIDSTATE STEEL INC Attorney MICHAEL J SULLIVAN added to party MACON MACHINE INC(pty:dft), Attorney MICHAEL J SULLIVAN added to party MIDSTATE STEEL INC(pty:dft)(SULLIVAN, MICHAEL)
June 1, 2023 Filing 21 Jurisdictional Statement by MACON MACHINE INC, MIDSTATE STEEL INC (EBBS, ARTHUR)
June 1, 2023 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MACON MACHINE INC, MIDSTATE STEEL INC identifying Corporate Parent MACON MACHINE INC for MIDSTATE STEEL INC. (EBBS, ARTHUR)
June 1, 2023 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #19 Answer to Complaint filed by MACON MACHINE INC, MIDSTATE STEEL INC ); All nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. See Local Rule 87.1In diversity cases, a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties. Please file the required statement immediately. See Local Rule 87.2.(sst)
May 26, 2023 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, by MACON MACHINE INC, MIDSTATE STEEL INC.(EBBS, ARTHUR)Attorney ARTHUR ALLEN EBBS added to party MACON MACHINE INC(pty:dft), Attorney ARTHUR ALLEN EBBS added to party MIDSTATE STEEL INC(pty:dft)
May 10, 2023 Filing 18 STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint,,,,, by MACON MACHINE INC, MIDSTATE STEEL INC (EBBS, ARTHUR)
May 10, 2023 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint,,,,, by MACON MACHINE INC, MIDSTATE STEEL INC (EBBS, ARTHUR)
April 25, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NATIONAL TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY, FCCI INSURANCE COMPANY as to MIDSTATE STEEL INC. (SAVRIN, PHILIP)
April 25, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NATIONAL TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY, FCCI INSURANCE COMPANY as to MACON MACHINE INC. (SAVRIN, PHILIP)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 Consent Motion to Dismiss Parties. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 4/21/2023. (kat)
April 19, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Party SYLVIA ELLIS, FREDDIE GRAHAM, JANET GRAHAM by FCCI INSURANCE COMPANY filed by PHILIP W SAVRIN. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation, #2 Email 1, #3 Email 2, #4 Proposed Order)(SAVRIN, PHILIP)
April 11, 2023 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCCI INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent FCCI INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate FCCI INSURANCE GROUP, Other Affiliate NATIONAL TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate FCCI GROUP INC, Other Affiliate FCCI MUTUAL INSURANCE HOLDING, Other Affiliate MONROE GUARANTY INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate FCCI COMMERCIAL INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate FCCI ADVANTAGE INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate BRIERFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY for FCCI INSURANCE COMPANY. (SAVRIN, PHILIP)
April 11, 2023 Filing 11 Jurisdictional Statement by FCCI INSURANCE COMPANY (SAVRIN, PHILIP)
April 11, 2023 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Other Affiliate FCCI INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate FCCI INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate FCCI GROUP INC, Other Affiliate FCCI GROUP INC, Other Affiliate FCCI GROUP INC, Other Affiliate FCCI MUTUAL INSURANCE HOLDING for NATIONAL TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY. (SAVRIN, PHILIP)
April 11, 2023 Filing 9 Jurisdictional Statement by NATIONAL TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY (SAVRIN, PHILIP)
April 11, 2023 Filing 8 *** Disregard refiled at #9 *** Jurisdictional Statement by NATIONAL TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY (SAVRIN, PHILIP) Modified on 4/11/2023 (elp).
April 7, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to JANET GRAHAM. (sst)
April 7, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to FREDDIE GRAHAM. (sst)
April 7, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to SYLVIA ELLIS as special administrator for the Estate of Don Ellis. (sst)
April 7, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to SYLVIA ELLIS, Individually. (sst)
April 7, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MIDSTATE STEEL INC. (sst)
April 7, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to MACON MACHINE INC. (sst)
April 7, 2023 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint,,,,, filed by NATIONAL TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY, FCCI INSURANCE COMPANY ); In diversity cases, a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties. Please file the required statement immediately. See Local Rule 87.2.(sst)
April 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4341060, $402 filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Ellis Lawsuit, #3 Exhibit B - Graham Lawsuit, #4 Exhibit C - CPP0013729-1, #5 Exhibit D - CPP0013729-2, #6 Exhibit E - CPP0013729-3, #7 Exhibit F - CPP0013729-4, #8 Exhibit G - CPP0013729-5, #9 Exhibit H - CPP0013729-6, #10 Exhibit I - CPP0013729-7, #11 Exhibit J - CPP100043173-01, #12 Exhibit K - CPP100043173-02, #13 Exhibit L - CPP100043173-03, #14 Exhibit M - CPP100076317-00, #15 Exhibit N - UMB0014035-1, #16 Exhibit O - UMB0014035-2, #17 Exhibit P - UMB0014035-4, #18 Exhibit Q - UMB0014035-5, #19 Exhibit R - UMB0014035-6, #20 Exhibit S - UMB100023735-01, #21 Exhibit T - UMB100023735-02, #22 Exhibit U - UMB100023735-03, #23 Exhibit V - UMB100023735-04, #24 Exhibit W - UMB100076319-00, #25 Exhibit X - UMB0014035-3, #26 Summons to Macon Machine, Inc., #27 Summons to Midstate Steel, Inc., #28 Summons to Sylvia Ellis, Individually, #29 Summons to Sylvia Ellis, as Special Administrator, #30 Summons to Freddie Graham, #31 Summons to Janet Graham)(SAVRIN, PHILIP) (Attachment 3 replaced on 4/7/2023) (sst).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONAL TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY et al v. MACON MACHINE INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: PHILIP W SAVRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FCCI INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: PHILIP W SAVRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MACON MACHINE INC
Represented By: MICHAEL J SULLIVAN
Represented By: ARTHUR ALLEN EBBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDSTATE STEEL INC
Represented By: ARTHUR ALLEN EBBS
Represented By: MICHAEL J SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYLVIA ELLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FREDDIE GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANET GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?