BUCKMAN et al v. MARINE GROUP LLC
Plaintiff: HERBERT C BUCKMAN, SR and DOROTHY P BUCKMAN
Defendant: MARINE GROUP LLC
Case Number: 5:2023cv00474
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Marine Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Filing 15 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint/Petition by MARINE GROUP LLC.(HANSMANN, BRADLEY)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING #13 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 1/11/2024. (kat)
January 10, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #10 Amended Complaint/Petition : by MARINE GROUP LLC filed by BRADLEY R HANSMANN. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Dft's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A- Complaint, #3 Exhibit B- Carefree Marine Group Ledger)(HANSMANN, BRADLEY)
January 10, 2024 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #12 Memorandum in Support filed by MARINE GROUP LLC, #11 Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by MARINE GROUP LLC ); Document must be re-filed to include the Memorandum in support and its Exhibits as Attachments to the main Document Motion to Dismiss. (elp)
January 2, 2024 Filing 12 ***DISREGARD REFILED at 13 ***MEMORANDUM in Support filed by MARINE GROUP LLC re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #10 Amended Complaint/Petition : (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Carefree Marine Group Ledger)(HANSMANN, BRADLEY) Modified on 1/11/2024 TO ADD DISREGARD DOCKET TEXT (elp).
January 2, 2024 Filing 11 ***REFILED at #13 *** MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #10 Amended Complaint/Petition : by MARINE GROUP LLC filed by BRADLEY R HANSMANN.(HANSMANN, BRADLEY) Motion terminated and text modified to add reason for termination on 1/11/2024 (kat).
December 20, 2023 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT re #1 Notice of Removal, against All Plaintiffs by DOROTHY P BUCKMAN (PHILLIPS, JOHN) Modified on 12/20/2023 to edit title. (ggs).
December 19, 2023 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #9 Motion to Amend/Correct filed by DOROTHY P BUCKMAN ); Document must be re-filed using correct event which is Amended Complaint. The document attached to the existing docket entry is not a motion.(mdm)
December 18, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, by DOROTHY P BUCKMAN filed by JOHN M PHILLIPS.(PHILLIPS, JOHN)
December 18, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, by DOROTHY P BUCKMAN filed by JOHN M PHILLIPS.(PHILLIPS, JOHN)
December 18, 2023 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #8 Motion to Amend/Correct filed by DOROTHY P BUCKMAN ); The PACER login ID and password used to electronically file a document constitutes the Participants electronic signature for all purposes under the Federal Rules. Document must be re-filed using the user credentials of the name of the attorney in the signature block. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures.(elp)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by BRADLEY R HANSMANN. (ksl)
December 14, 2023 Filing 6 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE on behalf of MARINE GROUP LLC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4524502, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: J. Travis Hall 357464. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(HANSMANN, BRADLEY)
December 14, 2023 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #5 Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice, filed by MARINE GROUP LLC ); The signature block does not include the Signature of the filer. Please Sign and re-file Petition. (elp)
December 13, 2023 Filing 5 *** DISREGARD RE-FILED AT #6 *** PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE on behalf of MARINE GROUP LLC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4522804, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: J. Travis Hall 357464. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(HANSMANN, BRADLEY) Modified on 12/14/2023 (elp).
December 12, 2023 SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Attorney HANSMANN is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements.(elp)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by The Marine Group, LLC filed by JON TRAVIS HALL. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Complaint)(HALL, JON)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 Jurisdictional Statement by The Marine Group, LLC (HALL, JON)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Marine Group, LLC (HALL, JON)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Dorothy P Buckman, Herbert C Buckman, Sr Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4510476, $402 filed by The Marine Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' Demand Letter) All parties must refile pending motions from the court of origin in this new case.(HALL, JON)
November 27, 2023 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by THE MARINE GROUP LLC ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The attorney case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Please do not re-file; corrections made by case manager.(tlp)
November 27, 2023 NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Attorney HANSMANN is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements.(tlp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUCKMAN et al v. MARINE GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HERBERT C BUCKMAN, SR
Represented By: JOHN M PHILLIPS
Represented By: WILLIAM KENNETH WALKER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOROTHY P BUCKMAN
Represented By: WILLIAM KENNETH WALKER, III
Represented By: JOHN M PHILLIPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARINE GROUP LLC
Represented By: JON TRAVIS HALL
Represented By: BRADLEY R HANSMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?