MALDONADO v. EMMONS et al
Plaintiff: PABLO F MALDONADO
Defendant: WARDEN EMMONS, MAJOR JOHN DOE, OFFICER ALFORD, NURSE COBB, NURSE JANE DOE, UNIT MANAGER SCOTT, DOCTOR FINDERSON, DOCTOR FOLKS, DOCTOR HEINACHO, DOCTOR EFOBI, NURSE HAYES, THEA DELAGE and JOSH MOORE
Case Number: 5:2023cv00505
Filed: December 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2024 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re: #1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by PABLO F MALDONADO (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A- Wellstar Spalding Regional Hospital, #3 Exhibit B- Health Services Request Form, #4 Envelope)(sst)
February 2, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Party THEA DELAGE, JOSH MOORE Filed by PABLO F MALDONADO. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support, # 2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Certificate of Service, # 4 Exhibit A- ED in Wellstar Spalding Regional Hospital Emergency, # 5 Exhibit B- Health Service Request Form, #6 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(sst) Modified docket text on 2/6/2024, attachment 1, 2, 4 and 5 were removed and filed separately (sst).
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to submit a motion to proceed IFP with a Prisoner Account Statement (Certified Copy) on the proper form. ORDER to Recast Complaint on the proper form. The Clerk is directed to forward the proper forms to Plaintiff. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 1/22/2024. (mlb)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (ggs)
December 15, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by PABLO F MALDONADO. (Attachments: #1 Partial Trust Account Statement, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(ggs)
December 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against All Defendants, filed by PABLO F MALDONADO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs) Modified event type to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order on 2/8/2024 (ans). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction event type on 2/8/2024 (ans).
December 15, 2023 NOTICE RE FILING IN PROPER DIVISION: re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint. Your documents were sent to a division other than the division where your case is pending. Although not required, in order to expedite filing we recommend you send documents to the division where your case is pending. Please send all future documents to: U.S. District Court, P. O. Box 128, Macon GA 31202.(ggs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MALDONADO v. EMMONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PABLO F MALDONADO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARDEN EMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAJOR JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER ALFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE COBB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIT MANAGER SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOCTOR FINDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOCTOR FOLKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOCTOR HEINACHO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOCTOR EFOBI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE HAYES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THEA DELAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSH MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?