USSERY v. HOUSTON COUNTY GEORGIA et al
Plaintiff: DONALD J USSERY, JR
Defendant: HOUSTON COUNTY GEORGIA and MARK DANIEL HEBERLIG
Case Number: 5:2024cv00116
Filed: April 15, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2024 Filing 18 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER FOR REPLY. Plaintiff filed a response #14 to the defendants' #9 motion to dismiss. Defendants' reply due by 6/25/2024. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 6/11/2024. (laf)
June 10, 2024 Filing 17 RESPONSE filed by MARK DANIEL HEBERLIG, HOUSTON COUNTY GEORGIA re #15 MOTION to Continue (ROLLINS, RALEIGH)
June 7, 2024 Filing 16 EXHIBIT(S) by DONALD J USSERY, JR re #15 MOTION to Continue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript, #2 Exhibit Email Correspondence (Scanned as received))(elp)
May 24, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION to Continue Filed by DONALD J USSERY, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Probation Letter)(elp)
May 24, 2024 Filing 14 RESPONSE filed by DONALD J USSERY, JR re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Probation Letter)(elp)
May 24, 2024 REMARK: USB DRIVE received and uploaded to the Digital Evidence Vault re #12 Affidavit. (elp)
May 15, 2024 REMARK: Plaintiff has not received documents [9,11,12,13] Due to mail back log. I provided Plaintiff Copy of DE 9,11,12, 13 on 5/15/2024. (elp)
May 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER (Griffth Notice) re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MARK DANIEL HEBERLIG, HOUSTON COUNTY GEORGIA. If Ussery wishes to respond, he must do so no later than TWENTY-ONE DAYS from the receipt of this Order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of the motion to dismiss and its exhibits (Docs. 9; 9-1; 9-2; 12) to Ussery at his last known address. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 5/9/2024. (kat)
May 6, 2024 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT re #9 Affidavit OF MARK DANIEL HEBERLIG by MARK DANIEL HEBERLIG, HOUSTON COUNTY GEORGIA (ROLLINS, RALEIGH) Modified on 5/6/2024 LINK TO ECF NO 9(elp).
May 6, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by MARK DANIEL HEBERLIG, HOUSTON COUNTY GEORGIA re #10 Affidavit (ROLLINS, RALEIGH)
May 6, 2024 Filing 10 DISREGARD REFILED AT #12 AFFIDAVIT re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by MARK DANIEL HEBERLIG, HOUSTON COUNTY GEORGIA (ROLLINS, RALEIGH) Modified on 5/6/2024 TO ADD DIREGARD LANGUAGE TO DOCKET TEXT (elp).
May 6, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by MARK DANIEL HEBERLIG, HOUSTON COUNTY GEORGIA filed by RALEIGH ROLLINS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A CERTIFIED SENTENCE AND PROBATION ORDER)(ROLLINS, RALEIGH)
May 6, 2024 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #10 Affidavit filed by MARK DANIEL HEBERLIG, HOUSTON COUNTY GEORGIA ); Document must be converted into text-searchable PDF format and re-filed. *** FOR FUTURE REFERENCE ONLY Exhibits and/or other supporting documents with an electronic filing shall be filed as a separate PDF attachment(s) to the MAIN filing ( ECF NO. 9) See Administrative Procedures for Electronic Filing. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures (elp)
May 1, 2024 Filing 8 EXHIBIT(S) by DONALD J USSERY, JR re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Documents)(elp)
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 4/24/2024 (kat)
April 18, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DONALD J USSERY, JR as to HOUSTON COUNTY GEORGIA. (elp)
April 18, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DONALD J USSERY, JR as to MARK DANIEL HEBERLIG. (elp) (Main Document 5 replaced on 4/18/2024) (elp).
April 17, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons HEBERLIG)(elp)
April 17, 2024 Filing 3 EXHIBIT by DONALD J USSERY, JR re #1 Complaint (elp)
April 17, 2024 REMARK: USB DRIVE received and uploaded to the Digital Evidence Vault re #3 Exhibit Notice. #1 Complaint (elp)
April 16, 2024 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by DONALD J USSERY, JR ); Every pleading, written motion and other papers must be signed by a party personally if the party is unrepresented. You must re-file your signed document within 14 days from the date of this notice. Failure to comply with this notice may result in dismissal of your case by the Court. See F.R.Civ.P. 11.(elp)
April 15, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Filed by DONALD J USSERY, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Medical Letter)(elp) (Main Document 2 replaced on 4/17/2024) (elp). Modified on 4/17/2024 TO ADD SIGNED COPY OF MOTION TO DOCKET (elp).
April 15, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by DONALD J USSERY, JR. Filing Fee: PAID RECEIPT NO. 43390 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Photo of Taillights, #3 Exhibit Officer Surety Bond & Oath of Office, #4 Exhibit Ante Litem Notice, #5 Exhibit Emails with Public Defender, #6 Exhibit ACCG COMMUNICATION, #7 Exhibit Family Medical Emergency Documentation, #8 Exhibit Transcript Request and Emails, #9 Exhibit Habeas Corpus Information, #10 Exhibit Witness Statement, #11 Exhibit Statues related to Case Lawsuit, #12 Envelope Victim of Defendant News Article, #13 Exhibit Misc related Photos and Documents, #14 Exhibit List)(elp) Modified on 4/15/2024 TO ADD RECEIPT NUMBER (elp). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/17/2024: #15 Exhibit 14- Photo of youtube screenshot) (elp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USSERY v. HOUSTON COUNTY GEORGIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD J USSERY, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOUSTON COUNTY GEORGIA
Represented By: RALEIGH ROLLINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK DANIEL HEBERLIG
Represented By: RALEIGH ROLLINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?