TURNER v. THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: YEHOWSHUA I TURNER
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE
Case Number: 5:2024cv00133
Filed: April 30, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Supplement Complaint Filed by YEHOWSHUA I TURNER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Medical Records Request, #2 Prayer for Relief Supplement)(mdm)
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL. (mdm)
June 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING #11 Motion for Supplemental Relief and DISMISSING without prejudice Plaintiff's Complaint. The Court further certifies an appeal would not be taken in good faith because there are no non-frivolous issues to raise on appeal. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 6/21/2024. (kat)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Conventional Filing by YEHOWSHUA I TURNER (Attachments: #1 Evidence Description)(elp)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order REMARK: USB Drive received and uploaded to the Digital Evidence Vault. USB drive is located on the shelf in the clerk's office. (elp)
June 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint, against All Defendants by YEHOWSHUA I TURNER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Medical Records)(mdm)
June 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint against THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE by YEHOWSHUA I. TURNER (tlf). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2024: #1 Medical Records) (tlf).
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Relief Supplement Filed by YEHOWSHUA I TURNER.(ans)
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED #1 Complaint, against All Defendants by YEHOWSHUA I TURNER (sst)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Conventional Filings by YEHOWSHUA I TURNER re #8 Amended Complaint/Petition, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List for Thumb Drive-Audio Exhibits are located in the digital vault. The thumb drive is located on the shelf in the clerk's office)(sst)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED #1 Complaint, against THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE by YEHOWSHUA I TURNER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 20- Deceased Donald T Pictures, #3 Exhibit 21 and 22- Religious background, #4 Exhibit 23- What age Skin Color Finally sets, #5 Exhibit 24 and 25- Can a person change skin colors, #6 Exhibit 26- Can being exposed to chemical agents cause skin color, #7 Exhibit 27- Effects of Torture, #8 Exhibit 28- Can biological agents toxins cause strokes, #9 Exhibit 29, 30, and 31- YEHOWSHUA T's 2017 blood cell count, #10 Exhibit 32 and 33-Yehaushua T's 2020 blood cell count, #11 Exhibit 34 and 35- 2017 YEHOWSHUA T reporting mental health, #12 Exhibit 36, 37, 38, and 39-2019 YEHOWSHUA T reporting mental health, #13 Exhibit 40- email, #14 Exhibit 41- email, #15 Exhibit 42 and 43- Grievance, #16 Exhibit 44- email, #17 Exhibit 45- Grievance steps, #18 Exhibit 46- Email, #19 Exhibit 47- Email, #20 Exhibit 50- what is unlawful)(sst)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 EXHIBIT(S) Amended Civil Cover Sheet by YEHOWSHUA I TURNER re #1 Complaint, (sst)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint, against THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE by YEHOWSHUA I TURNER (sst)
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. ORDER to Amend Complaint: Turner is ORDERED to amend his complaint no later than Monday, June 3, 2024. Turner's failure to fully and timely comply with this order may result in the dismissal of this action. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 5/13/2024. (kat)
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint, against All Defendants by YEHOWSHUA I TURNER (sst)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Conventional Filings by YEHOWSHUA I TURNER re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List for Thumb Drive, Audio, Screenshots of text Message and Video Exhibits are located in the digital vault. The thumb drive is located on the shelf in the clerk's office)(sst) Modified date filed on 5/2/2024 to correct the date (sst).
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by YEHAWSHEA I TURNER.(sst)
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants,filed by YEHAWSHEA I TURNER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 1,2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8 - Photos of biological agent, #4 Exhibit 9- Email, #5 Exhibit 10- Email, #6 Exhibit 11- Email, #7 Exhibit 12- Forms, #8 Exhibit 13- Forms, Plaintiff will return at a later date with a thumb drive that has the remaining exhibits on it)(sst)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TURNER v. THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YEHOWSHUA I TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?