Kingdom Insurance Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kingdom Insurance Group LLC, Kingdom Business Services LLC, Kingdomcare LLC and Kingdom Benefits Association LLC
Defendant: Cutler and Associates Inc, Shep R Cutler and United Healthcare Insurance Company
Case Number: 7:2010cv00085
Filed: August 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Valdosta Office
County: Thomas
Presiding Judge: Hugh Lawson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 5/31/2011. (nbp)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER directing defendants to file a brief in response to 40 Motion to Amend not later than 5/2/2011. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 4/21/2011. (nbp)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 13 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Attorney Michael P. Bruyere and John F. Kane terminated. 30 Request for Oral Argument is denied. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 4/4/2011. (nbp)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying 14 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 3/31/2011. (nbp)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER directing defendants to file recast motions to dismiss no later than 9/20/2010; directing Clerk's office to terminate 8 Motion to Dismiss as moot; directing any other motions for this Court be recast by 9/20/2010; directing plaintiffs to file their Motion for Reconsideration no later than 9/20/2010. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 9/13/2010. (nbp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kingdom Insurance Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kingdom Insurance Group LLC
Represented By: Michael P. Bruyere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kingdom Business Services LLC
Represented By: Michael P. Bruyere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kingdomcare LLC
Represented By: Michael P. Bruyere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kingdom Benefits Association LLC
Represented By: Michael P. Bruyere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cutler and Associates Inc
Represented By: William Pope Langdale, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shep R Cutler
Represented By: William Pope Langdale, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?