Palmer et al v. Convergys Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Michelle J Palmer and Michael E Cantrell
Defendant: Convergys Corporation and Convergys Customer Management Group Inc
Case Number: 7:2010cv00145
Filed: December 9, 2010
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Valdosta Office
County: Lowndes
Presiding Judge: Hugh Lawson
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2012 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY; deadline for dispositive motions is 3/2/2012. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 2/10/2012. (nbp)
February 9, 2012 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 42 Motion to Certify Class; granting 53 Motion to Strike. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 2/9/2012. (nbp)
April 6, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER memorializing 3/14/11 phone conference re: discovery dispute. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 4/6/2011. (nbp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer et al v. Convergys Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle J Palmer
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Shaw
Represented By: Dean R. Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E Cantrell
Represented By: Dean R. Fuchs
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Convergys Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Convergys Customer Management Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?