UNDERWOOD v. MOULTRIE GEORGIA et al

Defendant: Moultrie Police Department and MOULTRIE GEORGIA
Plaintiff: ANDREW UNDERWOOD
Case Number: 7:2013cv00013
Filed: February 8, 2013
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Valdosta Office
County: Colquitt
Presiding Judge: Hugh Lawson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER changing the date for motions to join parties or amend pleadings to 9/30/2013. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 5/14/2013. (nbp)
March 10, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Motion to Set Aside Judgment. Ordered by U.S. District Judge HUGH LAWSON on 3/10/2014. (nbp)
July 24, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Ordered by U.S. District Judge HUGH LAWSON on 7/24/2014. (nbp)
September 4, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Settlement. Ordered by U.S. District Judge HUGH LAWSON on 9/4/2014. (nbp)
September 5, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing parties to file joint motion for court review of settlement agreement with attached agreement; vacating 28 Order of Settlement. Clerk is directed to reopen the case. Ordered by U.S. District Judge HUGH LAWSON on 9/5/2014. (nbp)
September 30, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion Regarding Proposed Settlement. Ordered by U.S. District Judge HUGH LAWSON on 9/30/2014. (nbp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNDERWOOD v. MOULTRIE GEORGIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moultrie Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOULTRIE GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW UNDERWOOD
Represented By: JOSEPH D WEATHERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.