CROMARTIE (DEATH PENALTY) v. GEORGIA DIAGNOSTIC AND CLASSIFICATION PRISON
Petitioner: RAY JEFFERSON CROMARTIE
Respondent: GEORGIA DIAGNOSTIC AND CLASSIFICATION PRISON
Case Number: 7:2014cv00039
Filed: March 20, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Valdosta Office
County: Thomas
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER DENYING Cromartie's petition for writ of habeas corpus, his requests for discovery, and his requests for an evidentiary hearing. The Court finds the standard for the grant of a COA has not been met. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 3/31/2017. (tlh)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING 50 Motion Access to Petitioner for Expert Evaluations. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 4/24/2015. (tlh)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DENYING 47 Motion to suspend the briefing schedule and GRANTING 48 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Habeas Petition. The amended petition will be due on or before June 5, 2015. Respondent will have until July 5, 2015 to file his answer, which must comply with Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Petitioner will have until September 3, 2015 to brief all claims, issues, and arguments he wish es the Court to consider, and to seek discovery and/or an evidentiary hearing. Respondent shall have until November 2, 2015 to file a response and Petitioner will have until December 3, 2015 to file his reply. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 3/12/2015. (tlh)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING 45 Motion to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 1/16/2015. (tlh)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYING 9 Motion to Dismiss. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 12/29/2014. (tlh)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel and GRANTING 11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney BRIAN S KAMMER terminated. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 4/14/2014. (tlh)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Court treats Respondent's motion to vacate as a motion 10 requesting the Court to consider the merits of his motion to dismiss before requiring compliance with the Court's March 24, 2014 Order. The Court GRANTS this request. Until further order from the Court, Respondent is not required to file an answer or file the records required by Rule 5. Petitioner is ORDERED to respond to Respondents motion to dismiss by May 2, 2014. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 4/2/2014. (tlh)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading regarding 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by RAY JEFFERSON CROMARTIE. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 3/24/2014. (tlh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CROMARTIE (DEATH PENALTY) v. GEORGIA DIAGNOSTIC AND CLASSIFICATION PRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RAY JEFFERSON CROMARTIE
Represented By: MARTIN J MCCLAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: GEORGIA DIAGNOSTIC AND CLASSIFICATION PRISON
Represented By: BETH A BURTON
Represented By: SABRINA D GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?