ROBBINS v. ROBERTSON et al
Plaintiff: MARQUISE ROBBINS
Defendant: WILLIAM ROBERTSON, MARTY ALLEN and JOHN AND OR JANE DOE
Case Number: 7:2015cv00124
Filed: July 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Valdosta Office
County: Lowndes
Presiding Judge: THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF
Presiding Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting 134 Motion to Reschedule Trial. The trial of this matter is continued to the February term of Court. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 8/22/2022. (sbd)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER denying 125 Motion for a General Verdict Form. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 7/29/2022. (sbd)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER denying without prejudice 110 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 111 Motion in Limine; granting 112 Motion in Limine. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 7/28/2022. (rlw)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 78 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Summary judgment is granted to Defendants on the RLUIPA claim but is denied on the Eighth Amendment claim on which genuine issues of material fact remain. This case remains set for the Court's August 2022 trial term on Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment and First Amendment claims. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 1/6/2022. (rlw)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting 97 Joint Motion to Reschedule Pretrial Conference and Trial. The trial in this case is CONTINUED to the Court's August 2022 trial term which begins on Monday, August 8, 2022. The January 18, 2022 pretrial conference is CANCELLED. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 1/3/2022 (rlw)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER for the Parties to confer regarding their availability for a pretrial conference and trial and file their request with the Court no later than Friday, December 31, 2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 12/22/2021. (sbd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROBBINS v. ROBERTSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARQUISE ROBBINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM ROBERTSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTY ALLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND OR JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?