WARD v. UNITED CUTLERY CORPORATION, et al
Plaintiff: SHANE WARD
Defendant: BUD K WORLD WIDE INC and UNITED CUTLERY CORPORATION
Case Number: 7:2018cv00173
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: HUGH LAWSON
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Filing 19 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Thomas Christoph Keller and Steven W. Quattlebaum terminated. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON on 11/29/2018. (aks)
November 26, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by BUD K WORLD WIDE INC, UNITED CUTLERY CORPORATION filed by JOSEPH WILLIAM ROHE.(ROHE, JOSEPH) Modified text on 11/26/2018 at attorney's office request. (sbd).
November 26, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by BUD K WORLD WIDE INC, UNITED CUTLERY CORPORATION ); Certificate of Service not attached. Motion needs to be refiled with a Certificate of Service. (sbd)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall have until December 19, 2018 to submit their proposed scheduling and discovery order. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON on 11/5/2018. (aks)
October 30, 2018 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BUD K WORLD WIDE INC, UNITED CUTLERY CORPORATION (ROHE, JOSEPH)
October 30, 2018 Filing 15 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File All Deadlines. by SHANE WARD filed by MICHAEL J MEHRMAN.(MEHRMAN, MICHAEL)
October 29, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JOSEPH WILLIAM ROHE on behalf of All Defendants Attorney JOSEPH WILLIAM ROHE added to party BUD K WORLD WIDE INC(pty:dft), Attorney JOSEPH WILLIAM ROHE added to party UNITED CUTLERY CORPORATION(pty:dft) (ROHE, JOSEPH)
October 29, 2018 SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL Steven W. Quattlebaum, Thomas Christoph Keller, Floyd A. Healy - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (sbd)
October 25, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by MICHAEL J MEHRMAN on behalf of SHANE WARD Attorney MICHAEL J MEHRMAN added to party SHANE WARD(pty:pla) (MEHRMAN, MICHAEL)
October 18, 2018 Filing 12 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 11/19/2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON on 10/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(nop)
October 12, 2018 Filing 11 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to SHANE WARD. (sbd)
October 12, 2018 Filing 10 Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:18-cv-00581. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 defendants United Cutlery Corporation and Bud K. Worldwide, Inc.'s motion to transfer; and directing the Clerk to immediately transfer the entire case file to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/12/2018. (kdr) [Transferred from ared on 10/12/2018.]
October 12, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by SHANE WARD ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. (sbd)
October 12, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Steven W. Quattlebaum, Thomas Christoph Keller, Floyd A. Healy - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (sbd)
October 12, 2018 US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON added. (sbd)
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 12/4/2018. Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/18/2018. Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 9/9/2019 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 10/9/18. (lp) [Transferred from ared on 10/12/2018.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, Motion to Transfer filed by Shane Ward. (Healy, Floyd) [Transferred from ared on 10/12/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 Motion to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, Motion to Transfer filed by All Defendants. (Keller, Thomas) [Transferred from ared on 10/12/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, Motion to Transfer by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Keller, Thomas) [Transferred from ared on 10/12/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Christoph Keller on behalf of All Defendants (Keller, Thomas) [Transferred from ared on 10/12/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven W. Quattlebaum on behalf of All Defendants (Quattlebaum, Steven) [Transferred from ared on 10/12/2018.]
September 4, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include the text, "(Filing Fee $400 paid. Receipt No. LIT868548.) Summons issued and returned to counsel." (thd) [Transferred from ared on 10/12/2018.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 REPORT on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office by the Clerk of Court. (thd) [Transferred from ared on 10/12/2018.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Design and Patent Infringement with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Shane Ward. (Filing Fee $400 paid. Receipt No. LIT868548.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) (Docket text modified on 9/4/2018 to include filing fee information and Summons issued.) (thd). [Transferred from ared on 10/12/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WARD v. UNITED CUTLERY CORPORATION, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANE WARD
Represented By: Floyd A. Healy
Represented By: MICHAEL J MEHRMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUD K WORLD WIDE INC
Represented By: Thomas Christoph Keller
Represented By: Steven W. Quattlebaum
Represented By: JOSEPH WILLIAM ROHE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED CUTLERY CORPORATION
Represented By: Thomas Christoph Keller
Represented By: Steven W. Quattlebaum
Represented By: JOSEPH WILLIAM ROHE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?