ROSEBERRY v. APPLE INC et al
Plaintiff: HELEN ROSEBERRY
Defendant: APPLE INC, VERIZON and BEST BUY
Case Number: 7:2018cv00189
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Reconsideration re #7 Order on Amended Motion, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by HELEN ROSEBERRY.(sbd)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #2 #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must pay the full statutory filing fee with 21 days or by Wednesday, January 9, 2019 to proceed. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 12/19/2018. (rlw)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed IFP Amending #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by HELEN ROSEBERRY.(rlw)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint against HELEN ROSEBERRY by HELEN ROSEBERRY (rlw)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Plaintiff is to amend her affidavit to proceed IFP and supplement her complaint with regard to the basis of jurisdiction by 12/12/2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 11/21/2018. (rlw)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to HELEN ROSEBERRY (rlw)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by HELEN ROSEBERRY.(rlw)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filed by HELEN ROSEBERRY. (rlw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROSEBERRY v. APPLE INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPLE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERIZON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEST BUY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HELEN ROSEBERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?