SYNOVUS BANK V WALTER W KELLEY, trustee
Defendant: Synovus Bank fka First Community Bank
Appellee: WALTER W KELLEY
Undetermined: CLERK KYLE GEORGE
Appellant: SYNOVUS BANK
Case Number: 7:2018cv00202
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAL entered 2/20/2018 by John T. Laney, III, United States Bankruptcy Judge. (rlw)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE filed by WALTER W KELLEY re #2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal. (LOVETT, THOMAS)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal from Interlocutory Order Filed by SYNOVUS BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Denying Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit B - Memorandum Opinion Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Denying Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment)(rlw)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT and MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAL filed by Synovus Bank fka First Community Bank(US BANKRUPTCY COURT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SYNOVUS BANK V WALTER W KELLEY, trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WALTER W KELLEY
Represented By: THOMAS D LOVETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: CLERK KYLE GEORGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synovus Bank fka First Community Bank
Represented By: DAVID ALLEN GARLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SYNOVUS BANK
Represented By: DAVID ALLEN GARLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?