DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE et al v. KELLEY
Appellant: OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC and DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE
Undetermined: CLERK KYLE GEORGE
Appellee: WALTER W KELLEY
Case Number: 7:2019cv00007
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: HUGH LAWSON
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE, OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC identifying Corporate Parent OCWEN MORTGAGE SERVICING, INC., Corporate Parent OCWEN FINANCIAL CORPORATION for OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC; Corporate Parent DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST CORPORATION, Corporate Parent DEUTSCHE BANK AG, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Holdings, Inc. for DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE. (WAGNER, AARON)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 Appellant's BRIEF by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE, OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appellants' Appendix)(WAGNER, AARON)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED Letter Regarding Bankruptcy Briefing Schedule to DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE, WALTER W KELLEY, OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC (rlw) Modified on 2/7/2019 (rlw).
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT by WALTER W KELLEY,amending #2 Notice of Attorney Appearance (LOVETT, THOMAS)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 Letter Regarding Bankruptcy Briefing Schedule to DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE, OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC. (sbd)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of BANKRUPTCY APPEAL RECORD filed. Bankruptcy APPEAL RECORD including docket sheet and trial exhibits attached. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these appeal documents.** (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Designations, #2 Exhibit Designations)(US BANKRUPTCY COURT, )
February 5, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #2 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by WALTER W KELLEY ); Document must be converted into text-searchable PDF format and refiled. (sbd)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by THOMAS DOZIER LOVETT, III on behalf of WALTER W KELLEY Attorney THOMAS DOZIER LOVETT, III added to party WALTER W KELLEY(pty:e) (LOVETT, THOMAS)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE, OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC(US BANKRUPTCY COURT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE et al v. KELLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Joy Campbell
Represented By: AARON ALAN WAGNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE
Represented By: Elizabeth Joy Campbell
Represented By: AARON ALAN WAGNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: CLERK KYLE GEORGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WALTER W KELLEY
Represented By: THOMAS D LOVETT
Represented By: THOMAS DOZIER LOVETT, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?