THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY v. ADAMS et al

Plaintiff: THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: WILLIS SHAN ADAMS, RUDY'S TIRE SERVICE, INC., Mr. RUDY ADAMS, RUDY ADAMS and RUDY'S TIRE SERVICE INC
Case Number: 7:2019cv00070
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 Georgia Attorney Admission Fee Met by THOMAS C MACDIARMID (nop)
June 6, 2019 SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL THOMAS C MACDIARMID - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (nop)
May 30, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #8 Waiver of Reply filed by THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY ); Other (enter description). A Request to Waive Service does not get filed with the Court. (sbd)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF Reply by THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Request to Waive Service of a Summons to Rudy Adams)(BRIESKE, JAMES)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL THOMAS C MACDIARMID - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (sbd)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. (sbd)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to WILLIS SHAN ADAMS. (sbd)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to RUDY'S TIRE SERVICE INC. (sbd)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to RUDY ADAMS. (sbd)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 Jurisdictional Statement by THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY (Brieske, James)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY (Brieske, James)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3162908, $400 filed by THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Tift County Superior Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B Certified Copy of Insurance Policy, #4 Exhibit C Reservation of Rights Letter, #5 Summons Rudy Adams, #6 Summons Rudy's Tire Service, #7 Summons Willis Shan Adams)(Brieske, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY v. ADAMS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIS SHAN ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUDY'S TIRE SERVICE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. RUDY ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUDY ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUDY'S TIRE SERVICE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: James T. Brieske
Represented By: JAMES T BRIESKE
Represented By: THOMAS C MACDIARMID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?